EP0537058 - Package for transportation, especially of infectious substances [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.03.1996 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.03.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.04.1996 [1996/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PASCAL, Christian 19, Rue de la Fontaine F-95270 Seugy / FR | [1993/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1993/15] | Representative(s) | Faber, Jean-Paul CABINET FABER 35, rue de Berne 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1993/15] | Faber, Jean-Paul CABINET FABER 35, rue de Berne F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 92402707.1 | 05.10.1992 | [1993/15] | Priority number, date | FR19910012358 | 08.10.1991 Original published format: FR 9112358 | [1993/15] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0537058 | Date: | 14.04.1993 | Language: | FR | [1993/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.02.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B65D81/38 | [1993/15] | CPC: |
B65D81/3862 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, GB, IT, LI [1993/15] | Title | German: | Verpackung zum Transport, insbesondere von infektösen Substanzen | [1993/15] | English: | Package for transportation, especially of infectious substances | [1993/15] | French: | Emballage pour le transport plus particulièrement de susbstances infectieuses | [1993/15] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 28.09.1993 | Examination requested [1993/49] | 02.03.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.03.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.06.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.07.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.10.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1996/17] | 24.11.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1996/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.1995 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3832009 ; | [A]EP0341056 ; | [A]FR1388978 ; | [A]US2971640 |