|
23.05.2002 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.06.2001 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.03.2001 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.03.2001 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
19.03.2001 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
17.01.2001 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
17.01.2001 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
24 |
|
18.12.2000 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
18.12.2000 |
Description |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
18.12.2000 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.12.2000 |
Request for assignment |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.11.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.11.2000 |
Processing of grant of a patent after appeal (internal) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.10.2000 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.06.2000 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.06.2000 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
20.06.2000 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.06.2000 |
F3314 Oral proceedings: Minutes (ex parte) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.06.2000 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.05.2000 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.05.2000 |
Claims |
Appeal |
5 |
|
24.05.2000 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
24.05.2000 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
24.05.2000 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.05.2000 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
07.03.2000 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.02.2000 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.02.2000 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
7 |
|
03.02.2000 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.01.2000 |
Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (ex parte) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.05.1999 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
25.05.1999 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
25.05.1999 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
25.05.1999 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
25.05.1999 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
25.05.1999 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
20.01.1999 |
F3346 Communication with reference to loss of rights, with time limit (ex parte) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
11.01.1996 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (ex parte) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.01.1996 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.12.1995 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
11.12.1995 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
11.12.1995 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
5 |
|
19.09.1995 |
Document concerning appeal fee |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.09.1995 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.08.1995 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.08.1995 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.08.1995 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
31.07.1995 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.07.1995 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.07.1995 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.07.1995 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.07.1995 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.07.1995 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.07.1995 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.07.1995 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.06.1995 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.05.1995 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.02.1995 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.02.1995 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.01.1995 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.12.1994 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of third party observations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.12.1994 |
Transmittal of third party observations to applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.12.1994 |
Observations by third parties |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.12.1994 |
Patent document filed by a Third party |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
26.04.1993 |
Refund order search fee |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.04.1993 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.04.1993 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.12.1992 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.12.1992 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.12.1992 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
30.12.1992 |
Description |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
30.12.1992 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.12.1992 |
Letter concerning search matters |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.12.1992 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
26 |
|
30.12.1992 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |