EP0570655 - Audio amplifier on-off control circuit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.11.2001 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 12.02.2003 [2003/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STMicroelectronics Srl Via C. Olivetti, 2 20041 Agrate Brianza (Milano) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1998/35] | For all designated states STMicroelectronics S.r.l. Via C. Olivetti, 2 20041 Agrate Brianza (Milano) / IT | ||
Former [1993/47] | For all designated states SGS-THOMSON MICROELECTRONICS S.r.l. Via C. Olivetti, 2 I-20041 Agrate Brianza (Milano) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nebuloni, Daniela Via Crispi, 21 I-20010 Bareggio / IT | 02 /
Fassina, Andrea Via Ercolano, 3 I-20155 Milano / IT | [1993/47] | Representative(s) | Cerbaro, Elena, et al Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1993/47] | Cerbaro, Elena, et al c/o Studio Torta, Via Viotti 9 I-10121 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 92830254.6 | 22.05.1992 | [1993/47] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0570655 | Date: | 24.11.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0570655 | Date: | 27.12.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.02.1993 | Classification | IPC: | H03G3/34, H03F1/30 | [1993/47] | CPC: |
H03G3/348 (EP,US);
H03F1/305 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, PT [1993/47] | Title | German: | Steuerschaltung zum Ein- und Ausschalten eines Audioverstärkers | [1993/47] | English: | Audio amplifier on-off control circuit | [1993/47] | French: | Circuit de commande pour la communication marche/arrêt d'un amplificateur audio | [1993/47] | Examination procedure | 01.02.1994 | Examination requested [1994/16] | 11.03.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.06.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.08.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.02.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.03.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.07.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.04.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.06.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.09.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 21.09.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.09.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 18.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 27.12.2000 | PT | 27.03.2001 | [2003/07] |
Former [2002/11] | PT | 27.03.2001 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0159079 (ATES COMPONENTI ELETTRON [IT]); | [A]EP0368528 (SGS THOMSON MICROELECTRONICS [IT]) |