|
22.08.2001 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.07.2001 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.07.2001 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.06.2001 |
Filing of the translation of the amended claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.06.2001 |
Translation of the claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.06.2001 |
Translation of the claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.06.2001 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.06.2001 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.06.2001 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
30.05.2001 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.03.2001 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.03.2001 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.02.2001 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
24 |
|
28.02.2000 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.02.2000 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
09.12.1999 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.12.1999 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.12.1999 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.12.1999 |
F3326 Communication with time limit (inter partes) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
23.03.1999 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.03.1999 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
11.03.1999 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
05.03.1999 |
F3326 Communication with time limit (inter partes) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
29.01.1999 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.01.1999 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.01.1999 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
13.11.1998 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.10.1998 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
23 |
|
26.08.1998 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.08.1998 |
F3028 Inadmissibility of the appeal: non-submission of the statement of grounds |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.08.1998 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.05.1998 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.05.1998 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.05.1998 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.05.1998 |
Document concerning appeal fee |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.04.1998 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.03.1998 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.03.1998 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.03.1998 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.03.1998 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.03.1998 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.03.1998 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.03.1998 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.03.1998 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.03.1998 |
Description |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.03.1998 |
Documents for the maintenance of the patent as amended |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.03.1998 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
6 |
|
09.03.1998 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.03.1998 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.03.1998 |
Means of redress |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.03.1998 |
Text intended for grant |
Opposition |
9 |
|
27.02.1998 |
Decision of the Opposition Division |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.08.1997 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.08.1997 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.08.1997 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.08.1997 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
4 |
|
06.08.1997 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.08.1997 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.07.1997 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.07.1997 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
4 |
|
23.07.1997 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.07.1997 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.07.1997 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.07.1997 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.07.1997 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.03.1997 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.03.1997 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
06.11.1996 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.11.1996 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.10.1996 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.10.1996 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.10.1996 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.10.1996 |
Request for written evidence |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.09.1996 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.09.1996 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
10 |
|
16.11.1995 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.09.1995 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.09.1995 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.09.1995 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.07.1995 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.06.1995 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.03.1995 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.03.1995 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
07.03.1995 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.02.1995 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.02.1995 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.10.1994 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
25.08.1993 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.11.1992 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.11.1992 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.04.1992 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.04.1992 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.04.1992 |
Description |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
02.04.1992 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.04.1992 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.04.1992 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
02.04.1992 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
02.04.1992 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |