EP0553291 - TREATMENT OF AUTOIMMUNE DISEASES BY ORAL ADMINISTRATION OF AUTOANTIGENS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.01.2007 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.08.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 03.09.2008 [2008/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AUTOIMMUNE, INC. 1199 Madia Street Pasadena, CA 91103 / US | [2002/01] |
Former [1995/45] | For all designated states AUTOIMMUNE, INC. 128 Spring Street Lexington, MA 02174 / US | ||
Former [1993/31] | For all designated states BRIGHAM AND WOMEN'S HOSPITAL 75 Francis Street Boston, Massachusetts 02115 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WEINER, Howard, L. 114 Somerset Road Brookline, MA 02146 / US | 02 /
HAFLER, David, A. 110 Forest Avenue West Newton, MA 02165 / US | [1993/31] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/31] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92900084.2 | 15.10.1991 | [1993/31] | WO1991US07542 | Priority number, date | US19900596936 | 15.10.1990 Original published format: US 596936 | [1993/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9206708 | Date: | 30.04.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0553291 | Date: | 04.08.1993 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.04.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0553291 | Date: | 08.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 30.04.1992 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.10.1994 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/00, A61K39/36, A61K39/395 | [1993/31] | CPC: |
A61K38/39 (EP,US);
A61K39/00 (KR);
A61K39/0008 (EP,US);
A61K39/36 (KR);
A61K39/395 (KR);
A61P37/00 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1993/31] | Title | German: | BEHANDLUNG VON AUTOIMMUNKRANKHEITEN DURCH ORALE VERABREICHUNG VON AUTOANTIGENEN | [1993/31] | English: | TREATMENT OF AUTOIMMUNE DISEASES BY ORAL ADMINISTRATION OF AUTOANTIGENS | [1993/31] | French: | TRAITEMENT DE MALADIES AUTO-IMMUNES PAR ADMINISTRATION ORALE D'AUTO-ANTIGENES | [1993/31] | Entry into regional phase | 15.04.1993 | National basic fee paid | 15.04.1993 | Search fee paid | 15.04.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.04.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.05.1992 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 15.04.1993 | Examination requested [1993/31] | 24.06.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 04.03.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.01.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.08.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.08.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.04.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 21.06.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.08.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.01.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 04.01.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.12.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/07] | Request for further processing for: | 21.06.2002 | Request for further processing filed | 21.06.2002 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 11.07.2002 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 11.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 11.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 15.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 14.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 14.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 07.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.11.1993 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   24.11.1993 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.03.2006 | BE | 08.03.2006 | NL | 08.03.2006 | DK | 08.06.2006 | SE | 08.06.2006 | GR | 09.06.2006 | LU | 15.10.2006 | [2008/36] |
Former [2008/21] | AT | 08.03.2006 | |
BE | 08.03.2006 | ||
NL | 08.03.2006 | ||
DK | 08.06.2006 | ||
SE | 08.06.2006 | ||
GR | 09.06.2006 | ||
Former [2007/16] | AT | 08.03.2006 | |
BE | 08.03.2006 | ||
NL | 08.03.2006 | ||
DK | 08.06.2006 | ||
SE | 08.06.2006 | ||
Former [2006/45] | AT | 08.03.2006 | |
NL | 08.03.2006 | ||
SE | 08.06.2006 | ||
Former [2006/43] | AT | 08.03.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]WO8810120 (BRIGHAM & WOMENS HOSPITAL [US]) [XD] 1-9 * page 6, line 1 - page 9, line 2 *; | [XP]WO9108760 (BRIGHAM & WOMENS HOSPITAL [US], et al) [XP] 1-18* page 13, line 17 - page 21, line 4 *; | [XP]WO9112816 (AUTOIMMUNE INC [US], et al) [XP] 1-18 * page 8, line 36 - page 16, line 23 * | [XD] - H. S. G. THOMPSON ET AL., "GASTRIC ADMINISTRATION OF TYPE II COLLAGEN DELAYS THE ONSET AND SEVERITY OF COLLAGEN-INDUCED ARTHRITIS IN RATS", CLINICAL AND EXPERIMENTAL IMMUNOLOGY, (198606), vol. 64, no. 3, pages 581 - 586 [XD] 1,2,10-12 * the whole document * | [XD] - PAUL J. HIGGINS ET AL., "SUPPRESSION OF EXPERIMENTAL AUTOIMMUNE ENCEPHALOMYELITIS BY ORAL ADMINISTRATION OF MYELIN BASIC PROTEIN AND ITS FRAGMENTS.", JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, BALTIMORE US, (19880115), vol. 140, no. 2, pages 440 - 445 [XD] 1-9,13-18 * the whole document * | International search | [Y] - Cellular Immunology, Volume 75, issued April 1983, SRIRAM et al, "Administration of Myelin Basic Protein-coupled Spleen Cells Prevents Experimental Allergic Encephalitis", pages 378-382, see entire document. | [Y] - Proceedings National Academy of Sciences, Volume 83, issued October 1986, NAGLER-ANDERSON et al. "Suppression of Type II Colagen-Induced Arthritis by Intragastric Administration of Soluble Type II Collagen", pages 7443-7446, see entire document. |