EP0567574 - MULTILAYER BOTTLE WITH SEPARABLE INNER LAYER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.01.1996 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CONTINENTAL PET TECHNOLOGIES, INC. 7310 Turfway Road, Suite 490 Florence KY 41042 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/44] | For all designated states CONTINENTAL PET TECHNOLOGIES, INC. 7310 Turfway Road, Suite 490 Florence KY 41042 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHMIDT, Steven, L. 27 Windsor Drive Merrimack, NH 03054 / US | 02 /
COLLETTE, Wayne, N. 19 French Court Merrimack, NH 03054 / US | 03 /
KRISHNAKUMAR, Suppayan, M. 23 Old Coach Road Nashua, NH 03062 / US | [1993/44] | Representative(s) | Jenkins, Peter David, et al Page White & Farrer Limited Bedford House 21A John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/44] | Jenkins, Peter David, et al PAGE WHITE & FARRER 54 Doughty Street London WC1N 2LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 92904633.2 | 10.01.1992 | [1993/44] | WO1992US00094 | Priority number, date | US19910644624 | 23.01.1991 Original published format: US 644624 | US19910698931 | 13.05.1991 Original published format: US 698931 | US19920814923 | 08.01.1992 Original published format: US 814923 | [1993/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9212926 | Date: | 06.08.1992 | [1992/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0567574 | Date: | 03.11.1993 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.08.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0567574 | Date: | 15.02.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.12.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B65D35/56 | [1993/44] | CPC: |
B67D1/0462 (EP,US);
B29C45/1646 (EP,US);
B65D1/0215 (EP,US);
B65D83/0055 (EP,US);
B29C2793/0045 (EP,US);
B29C2793/0054 (EP,US);
B29C2949/0715 (EP);
B29C2949/3008 (EP,US);
B29C2949/3009 (EP,US);
B29C2949/3012 (EP,US);
B29C2949/3016 (EP,US);
B29C2949/302 (EP,US);
B29C2949/3026 (EP,US);
B29C2949/3028 (EP,US);
B29C2949/303 (EP,US);
B29C2949/3032 (EP,US);
B29C2949/3034 (EP,US);
B29C2949/3036 (EP,US);
B29C2949/3038 (EP,US);
B29C2949/3094 (EP);
B29C49/06 (EP,US);
B29K2077/00 (EP,US);
B29K2105/26 (EP,US);
B29K2995/0069 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, SE [1993/44] | Title | German: | MEHRSCHICHTFLASCHE MIT EINER TRENNBAREN INNENSCHICHT | [1993/44] | English: | MULTILAYER BOTTLE WITH SEPARABLE INNER LAYER | [1993/44] | French: | BOUTEILLE MULTICOUCHE A COUCHE INTERIEURE SEPARABLE | [1993/44] | Entry into regional phase | 13.08.1993 | National basic fee paid | 13.08.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.08.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.08.1992 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: FR | 13.08.1993 | Examination requested [1993/44] | 21.04.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.08.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.11.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 01.11.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.11.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.02.1995 | BE | 15.02.1995 | CH | 15.02.1995 | DK | 15.02.1995 | ES | 15.02.1995 | GR | 15.02.1995 | IT | 15.02.1995 | LI | 15.02.1995 | MC | 15.02.1995 | NL | 15.02.1995 | SE | 15.05.1995 | [2008/02] |
Former [2002/25] | AT | 15.02.1995 | |
BE | 15.02.1995 | ||
CH | 15.02.1995 | ||
DK | 15.02.1995 | ||
ES | 15.02.1995 | ||
GR | 15.02.1995 | ||
IT | 15.02.1995 | ||
LI | 15.02.1995 | ||
MC | 15.02.1995 | ||
NL | 15.02.1995 | ||
SE | 15.05.1995 | ||
Former [2001/24] | AT | 15.02.1995 | |
BE | 15.02.1995 | ||
CH | 15.02.1995 | ||
DK | 15.02.1995 | ||
GR | 15.02.1995 | ||
IT | 15.02.1995 | ||
LI | 15.02.1995 | ||
MC | 15.02.1995 | ||
NL | 15.02.1995 | ||
SE | 15.05.1995 | ||
Former [2000/05] | AT | 15.02.1995 | |
BE | 15.02.1995 | ||
CH | 15.02.1995 | ||
DK | 15.02.1995 | ||
GR | 15.02.1995 | ||
IT | 15.02.1995 | ||
LI | 15.02.1995 | ||
NL | 15.02.1995 | ||
SE | 15.05.1995 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 15.02.1995 | |
BE | 15.02.1995 | ||
CH | 15.02.1995 | ||
DK | 15.02.1995 | ||
IT | 15.02.1995 | ||
LI | 15.02.1995 | ||
NL | 15.02.1995 | ||
SE | 15.05.1995 | ||
Former [1998/15] | AT | 15.02.1995 | |
BE | 15.02.1995 | ||
CH | 15.02.1995 | ||
DK | 15.02.1995 | ||
LI | 15.02.1995 | ||
NL | 15.02.1995 | ||
SE | 15.05.1995 | ||
Former [1996/04] | AT | 15.02.1995 | |
BE | 15.02.1995 | ||
CH | 15.02.1995 | ||
LI | 15.02.1995 | ||
NL | 15.02.1995 | ||
SE | 15.05.1995 | ||
Former [1995/49] | AT | 15.02.1995 | |
CH | 15.02.1995 | ||
LI | 15.02.1995 | ||
NL | 15.02.1995 | ||
Former [1995/40] | AT | 15.02.1995 | |
CH | 15.02.1995 | ||
LI | 15.02.1995 | ||
Former [1995/35] | CH | 15.02.1995 | |
LI | 15.02.1995 | Cited in | International search | [X]GB1455453 (PETTERSON T H); | [Y]US4609516 (KRISHNAKUMAR SUPPAYAN M [US], et al); | [X]EP0182094 ; | [E]WO9211187 (COCA COLA CO [US]) |