EP0522144 - GROUP ADDRESS CONCENTRATION THROUGH A NETWORK BRIDGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.01.1998 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.01.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.02.1998 [1998/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DIGITAL EQUIPMENT CORPORATION 146 Main Street Maynard, MA 01754 / US | [1993/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BACKLES, Floyd, J. Hadley Highway Temple, NH 03084 / US | 02 /
HAWE, William, R. 16 Independence Road Pepperell, MA 02190 / US | 03 /
KONING, G., Paul 4 Parker Road Brookline, NH 02127 / US | 04 /
MITTON, David, J. 13 Swan Street Arlington, MA 02130 / US | 05 /
PERLMAN, Radia, J. 10 Huckleberry Lane Acton, MA 01720 / US | [1993/02] | Representative(s) | Maggs, Michael Norman, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/02] | Maggs, Michael Norman, et al Kilburn & Strode 30 John Street London WC1N 2DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 92905803.0 | 24.01.1992 | [1993/02] | WO1992US00586 | Priority number, date | US19910645933 | 25.01.1991 Original published format: US 645933 | US19910645934 | 25.01.1991 Original published format: US 645934 | US19910645935 | 25.01.1991 Original published format: US 645935 | [1993/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9213410 | Date: | 06.08.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0522144 | Date: | 13.01.1993 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.08.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0522144 | Date: | 05.03.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.08.1992 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/18, H04L12/46 | [1993/02] | CPC: |
H04L12/1836 (EP);
H04L12/46 (EP);
H04L45/742 (EP);
H04L2212/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1993/02] | Title | German: | KONZENTRIERUNG VON GRUPPENADRESSEN IN EINER NETZWERKBRÜCKE | [1993/02] | English: | GROUP ADDRESS CONCENTRATION THROUGH A NETWORK BRIDGE | [1993/02] | French: | TRADUCTION D'ADRESSES DE GROUPES DU TYPE "PLUSIEURS A QUELQUES UNS" PAR UN PONT DE RESEAU | [1993/02] | Entry into regional phase | 29.09.1992 | National basic fee paid | 29.09.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.11.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.11.1992 | Examination requested [1993/02] | 19.05.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.11.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.09.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.10.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 30.10.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.12.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP0321203 | [Y] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN. vol. 33, no. 7, December 1990, NEW YORK US pages 63 - 68; 'Bridge for Interconnecting Local Area Networks Having Different Architectures' | [A] - COMPUTER COMMUNICATIONS vol. 12, no. 3, June 1989, LONDON, GB pages 123 - 130; L. HUGHES: 'Gateway Design for Internetwork Multicast Communication' |