EP0577695 - APPARATUS AND METHODS FOR BAGGAGE RECONCILIATION AND LOCATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 17.05.2002 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.05.2009 | Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representative | published on 24.06.2009 [2009/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Softlab GmbH Zamdorfer Strasse 120 81677 München / DE | [1998/52] |
Former [1998/12] | For all designated states BRITISH TECHNOLOGY GROUP LIMITED 10 Fleet Place London EC4M 7SB / GB | ||
Former [1996/30] | For all designated states BRITISH TECHNOLOGY GROUP LIMITED 101 Newington Causeway London SE1 6BU / GB | ||
Former [1994/02] | For all designated states BRaLS LIMITED Tring Business Park, Upper Icknield Way Tring, Hertfordshire HP23 5PG / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BUNCE, Timothy, Paul 155 Villiers Road Kingston-upon-Thames, Surrey KT1 3BD / GB | 02 /
EVERETT, Christopher, John, Stuart 15 Northview Crescent Epsom Downs, Surrey KT18 5UW / GB | 03 /
PATHAN, Saif, Khan 181/183 Kingshill Drive, Kenton Harrow, Middlesex HA3 8QT / GB | 04 /
WILLIAMS, David, Anthony "Pagsanjan", 5 Shootersway Park Berkhampstead, Hertfordshire / GB | [1994/02] | Representative(s) | Loth, Hans-Friedrich, et al Wessing & Berenberg-Gossler Rechtsanwälte Isartorplatz 8 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/52] | Loth, Hans-Friedrich, et al Wessing & Berenberg-Gossler, Rechtsanwälte, Isartorplatz 8 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [1998/02] | Buttrick, Richard British Technology Group Ltd, 101 Newington Causeway London SE1 6BU / GB | ||
Former [1996/30] | Funnell, Samantha Jane British Technology Group Ltd. Patents Department 101 Newington Causeway London SE1 6BU / GB | ||
Former [1994/02] | Hasler, Christopher Patents Department British Technology Group Ltd 101 Newington Causeway London SE1 6BU / GB | Application number, filing date | 92907923.4 | 26.03.1992 | [1994/02] | WO1992GB00555 | Priority number, date | US19910674916 | 26.03.1991 Original published format: US 674916 | [1994/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9217393 | Date: | 15.10.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0577695 | Date: | 12.01.1994 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.10.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0577695 | Date: | 10.05.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.10.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B65G47/50 | [1994/02] | CPC: |
B65G47/50 (EP,US);
G06Q10/02 (EP,US);
G07B15/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1994/02] | Title | German: | ANORDNUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR KORRELATION UND BESTIMMUNG VON GEPÄCK | [1995/19] | English: | APPARATUS AND METHODS FOR BAGGAGE RECONCILIATION AND LOCATION | [1994/02] | French: | APPAREIL ET METHODE DE VERIFICATION DE LA CORRESPONDANCE DES BAGAGES ET DE LEUR LOCALISATION | [1994/02] |
Former [1994/02] | Anordnung und Verfahren zur Korrelation und Bestimmung von Gepäck | Entry into regional phase | 22.10.1993 | National basic fee paid | 22.10.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.10.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.10.1992 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 22.10.1993 | Examination requested [1994/02] | 12.03.1994 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 07.04.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.04.1994 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 19.08.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.01.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 09.01.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 09.01.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
12.02.1996
26.05.1999
WITHDRAWN Flughafen Frankfurt/Main AG . 60547 Frankfurt/Main / DE Opponent's representative von Fischern, Bernhard Hoffmann - Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | 02
12.02.1996
26.02.1996
ADMISSIBLE INTERNATIONAL AIR TRANSPORT ASSOCIATION IATA Building, 2000 Peel Street Montreal, Quebec, H3A 2R4 / CA Opponent's representative Schaumburg und Partner Patentanwälte mbB Mauerkircherstraße 31 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/26] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
12.02.1996
26.05.1999
WITHDRAWN Flughafen Frankfurt/Main AG . 60547 Frankfurt/Main / DE Opponent's representative von Fischern, Bernhard Hoffmann Eitle, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
02
12.02.1996
26.02.1996
ADMISSIBLE INTERNATIONAL AIR TRANSPORT ASSOCIATION IATA Building, 2000 Peel Street Montreal, Quebec, H3A 2R4 / CA Opponent's representative Schaumburg, Thoenes, Thurn, Landskron, Eckert Patentanwälte Postfach 86 07 48 81634 München / DE | |||
Former [1996/15] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
12.02.1996
22.02.1996
ADMISSIBLE Flughafen Frankfurt/Main AG . 60547 Frankfurt/Main / DE Opponent's representative von Fischern, Bernhard Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
02
12.02.1996
26.02.1996
ADMISSIBLE INTERNATIONAL AIR TRANSPORT ASSOCIATION IATA Building, 2000 Peel Street Montreal, Quebec, H3A 2R4 / CA Opponent's representative Schaumburg, Thoenes, Thurn, Landskron, Eckert Patentanwälte Postfach 86 07 48 81634 München / DE | |||
Former [1996/14] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
12.02.1996
WITHDRAWN Flughafen Frankfurt/Main AG . 60547 Frankfurt/Main / DE Opponent's representative von Fischern, Bernhard Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | 10.05.1996 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 10.09.1996 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 10.11.1998 | Date of oral proceedings | 08.12.1998 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 14.02.2001 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 14.02.2001 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 30.05.2001 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 12.06.2001 | Fee for printing new specification paid | 29.01.2002 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 08.02.2002 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2002/27] | Appeal following opposition | 05.02.1999 | Appeal received No. T0162/99 | 08.04.1999 | Statement of grounds filed | 14.02.2001 | Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form | 14.02.2001 | Date of oral proceedings | 26.02.2001 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Request for further processing for: | 07.02.1995 | Request for further processing filed | 09.01.1995 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 15.02.1995 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 10.05.1995 | DK | 10.05.1995 | SE | 10.08.1995 | DE | 01.01.2000 | [2002/09] |
Former [1998/15] | AT | 10.05.1995 | |
DK | 10.05.1995 | ||
SE | 10.08.1995 | ||
Former [1996/04] | AT | 10.05.1995 | |
SE | 10.08.1995 | ||
Former [1996/02] | AT | 10.05.1995 | Cited in | International search | [X]NL8302826 (DACA ELEKTRONIK A G); | [X]US4711994 (GREENBERG JOEL S [US]); | [X]GB2224147 (CANZIANI FRANCESCO); | [A]EP0408809 (HUDSON SOFT CO LTD [JP]) | Examination | US4058217 | US4409470 |