Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0575519

EP0575519 - DATA PROCESSING SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR HUB AND SPOKE FINANCIAL SERVICES CONFIGURATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  13.03.1998
Database last updated on 17.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip13.03.1998Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 29.04.1998 [1998/18]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SIGNATURE FINANCIAL GROUP, INC.
6 St. James Avenue
Boston, MA 02116 / US
[1993/52]
Inventor(s)01 / BOES, R., Todd
10 Commercial Wharf South
Boston, MA 02110 / US
[1993/52]
Representative(s)Hirsch, Marc-Roger
Hirsch & Associés
58, Avenue Marceau
75008 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [1993/52]Hirsch, Marc-Roger
Cabinet Hirsch 34 rue de Bassano
F-75008 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date92908680.910.03.1992
[1993/52]
WO1992US02163
Priority number, dateUS1991066777711.03.1991         Original published format: US 667777
[1993/52]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9215953
Date:17.09.1992
Language:EN
[1992/24]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0575519
Date:29.12.1993
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.09.1992
[1993/52]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US17.09.1992
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.12.1993
ClassificationInternational:G06F15/21
[1993/52]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   SE [1993/52]
TitleGerman:Datenverarbeitungssystem und Verfahren für eine finanzielle "Hub und Spoke" Konfiguration[1993/52]
English:DATA PROCESSING SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR HUB AND SPOKE FINANCIAL SERVICES CONFIGURATION[1993/52]
French:SYSTEME ET PROCEDE DE TRAITEMENT DE DONNEES PERMETTANT D'OFFRIR UN ENSEMBLE DE SERVICES FINANCIERS SELON UNE CONCEPTION APPELEE "HUB AND SPOKE"[1993/52]
Entry into regional phase15.09.1993National basic fee paid 
15.09.1993Search fee paid 
15.09.1993Designation fee(s) paid 
15.09.1993Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.10.1992Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE
15.09.1993Examination requested  [1993/52]
20.12.1994Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
18.08.1995Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.02.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
17.10.1996Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.04.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.11.1997Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [1998/18]
04.12.1997Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [1998/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.02.1994Renewal fee patent year 03
08.03.1995Renewal fee patent year 04
14.03.1996Renewal fee patent year 05
06.03.1997Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search   [ ] No further relevant documents disclosed
International search[AP]  Barrons, 17 February 1992, EATON, "Mutual Funds: Wheeling and Dealing", page 39, column 3, see entire document (Abstract only provided)
 [AP]  Boston Business Journal, 11 November 1991, "Signature seeks patent for mutal fund wheel", page 6, see entire document (Abstract only provided)
 [AE]  BNA Securities Law Daily, 20 March 1992, "Dingell asks Breeden for report on so-called 'hub-and-spoke' funds", see entire document
 [AE]  Financial Services Week, 20 April 1992, "Hub-and-Spoke Funds Draw Regulators' Attention", see entire document
 [AE]  Business Wire (San Francisco, CA), 30 March 1992, BECKER, "Signature Licenses Hub and Spoke System to Van Eck Associates", page sl, pl, see entire document
 [AP]  DataPro Directory of Software, April 1991, McGraw-Hill Pub. Co., pages D15-450-001 to D15-450-017, see entire document
 [A]  The Wall Street Journal, 13 July 1987, SEBASTIAN, "More Groups Structure Funds as Partnerships", page 25, column 3, (Eastern Edition), see entire document (citation only provided)