EP0583297 - METHOD OF AND APPARATUS FOR FINE, VERY FINE, AND MICROFINE COMMINUTION OF MATERIALS HAVING BRITTLE BEHAVIOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.06.1998 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SCHÖNERT, Klaus Tannenhöhe 4 D-38678 Clausthal-Zellerfeld / DE | [1994/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHÖNERT, Klaus Tannenhöhe 4 D-3392 Clausthal-Zellerfeld / DE | 02 /
REICHARDT, York Zellbach 12 D-3392 Clausthal-Zellerfeld / DE | [1994/08] | Representative(s) | Behrens, Dieter Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/08] | Behrens, Dieter, Dr.-Ing. Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 D-81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92909433.2 | 04.05.1992 | [1994/08] | WO1992EP00962 | Priority number, date | DE19914114521 | 03.05.1991 Original published format: DE 4114521 | [1994/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9219379 | Date: | 12.11.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0583297 | Date: | 23.02.1994 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.11.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0583297 | Date: | 30.07.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.11.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B02C1/00, B02C19/00 | [1994/08] | CPC: |
B02C1/00 (EP,US);
B02C19/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1994/08] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR FEIN- UND FEINST- UND MIKROFEINZERKLEINERUNG VON SPRÖDEM MAHLGUT | [1997/31] | English: | METHOD OF AND APPARATUS FOR FINE, VERY FINE, AND MICROFINE COMMINUTION OF MATERIALS HAVING BRITTLE BEHAVIOR | [1994/08] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DE MOULINAGE DES MATERIAUX FRIABLE EN GRANULATS FINS, SUPERFINS ET MICROFINS | [1997/31] |
Former [1994/08] | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR FEIN-UND FEINSTVERTEILUNG VON SPRÖDEM MAHLGUT | ||
Former [1994/08] | PROCEDE DE CONCASSAGE DE MATERIAU FRIABLE EN GRANULATS FINS, SUPERFINS ET MICROFINS ET APPAREIL CON U A CET EFFET | Entry into regional phase | 04.11.1993 | National basic fee paid | 04.11.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.11.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.11.1992 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 04.11.1993 | Examination requested [1994/08] | 15.05.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.11.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.03.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 10.05.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.07.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.11.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.01.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 30.01.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.05.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 30.07.1997 | CH | 30.07.1997 | DK | 30.07.1997 | ES | 30.07.1997 | IT | 30.07.1997 | LI | 30.07.1997 | NL | 30.07.1997 | SE | 30.10.1997 | [2008/02] |
Former [2003/07] | BE | 30.07.1997 | |
CH | 30.07.1997 | ||
DK | 30.07.1997 | ||
ES | 30.07.1997 | ||
IT | 30.07.1997 | ||
LI | 30.07.1997 | ||
NL | 30.07.1997 | ||
SE | 30.10.1997 | ||
Former [2002/25] | BE | 30.07.1997 | |
CH | 30.07.1997 | ||
DK | 30.07.1997 | ||
ES | 30.07.1997 | ||
IT | 30.07.1997 | ||
LI | 30.07.1997 | ||
SE | 30.10.1997 | ||
Former [1999/42] | BE | 30.07.1997 | |
CH | 30.07.1997 | ||
DK | 30.07.1997 | ||
IT | 30.07.1997 | ||
LI | 30.07.1997 | ||
SE | 30.10.1997 | ||
Former [1998/43] | BE | 30.07.1997 | |
CH | 30.07.1997 | ||
DK | 30.07.1997 | ||
LI | 30.07.1997 | ||
SE | 30.10.1997 | ||
Former [1998/21] | BE | 30.07.1997 | |
DK | 30.07.1997 | ||
SE | 30.10.1997 | ||
Former [1998/15] | DK | 30.07.1997 | |
SE | 30.10.1997 | ||
Former [1998/12] | SE | 30.10.1997 | Cited in | International search | [X]DE2753920 (HYDROMER SOC CIV); | [Y]US4357287 (SCHOENERT KLAUS) |