|
15.04.2003 |
Communication to the parties concerning termination of the opposition proceedings - opposition rejected - no appeal lodged |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.04.2003 |
Communication to the parties concerning termination of the opposition proceedings - opposition rejected - no appeal lodged |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.04.2003 |
Communication to the parties concerning termination of the opposition proceedings - opposition rejected - no appeal lodged |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.04.2003 |
Communication to the parties concerning the termination of the opposition proceedings (opponent) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.04.2003 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.04.2003 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.01.2003 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.01.2003 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.01.2003 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.12.2002 |
Decision rejecting the opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.12.2002 |
Decision rejecting the opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.12.2002 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
6 |
|
30.12.2002 |
Means of redress |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.12.2002 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.12.2002 |
Documents for the maintenance of the patent as amended |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.12.2002 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.12.2002 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.09.2002 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.09.2002 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
09.09.2002 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
05.09.2002 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
19.07.2002 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.07.2002 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.07.2002 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.07.2002 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.07.2002 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
11.07.2002 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.07.2002 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.03.2002 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.08.2001 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.08.2001 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.08.2001 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.07.2001 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.07.2001 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
14 |
|
02.07.2001 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.06.2001 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.06.2001 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.06.2001 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.04.2001 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
29.01.2001 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.01.2001 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.10.2000 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.10.2000 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
7 |
|
02.10.2000 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
7 |
|
11.08.2000 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.08.2000 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.08.2000 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.07.2000 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
31.07.2000 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.07.2000 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.07.2000 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.06.2000 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.06.2000 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.05.2000 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.05.2000 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.05.2000 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.05.2000 |
Decision concerning the inadmissibility of the opposition to opponent |
Opposition |
3 |
|
23.05.2000 |
Documents for the maintenance of the patent as amended |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.05.2000 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
5 |
|
23.05.2000 |
Means of redress |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.05.2000 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.03.2000 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.03.2000 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.03.2000 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.03.2000 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.02.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.02.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.02.2000 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
15.02.2000 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.02.2000 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.02.2000 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.02.2000 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.02.2000 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.02.2000 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
25.09.1999 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.09.1999 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.08.1999 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.08.1999 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.08.1999 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
24.08.1999 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.08.1999 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.08.1999 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.08.1999 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.07.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.07.1999 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
12.07.1999 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.07.1999 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.07.1999 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.07.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.07.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.07.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.06.1999 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
11.06.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.05.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.05.1999 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.05.1999 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.05.1999 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.05.1999 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.05.1999 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.05.1999 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.03.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.03.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.02.1999 |
Drawings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.02.1999 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
7 |
|
21.02.1999 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
9 |
|
27.01.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.01.1999 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.12.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.12.1998 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.12.1998 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.12.1998 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.08.1998 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
3 |
|
10.08.1998 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
18.07.1997 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.07.1997 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
4 |
|
11.07.1997 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.07.1997 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.06.1997 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.06.1997 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.05.1997 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.05.1997 |
Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor |
Opposition |
4 |
|
15.05.1997 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.03.1997 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.03.1997 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.03.1997 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.01.1997 |
Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.12.1996 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
03.12.1996 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.12.1996 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.12.1996 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.11.1996 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.07.1996 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.07.1996 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.07.1996 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.07.1996 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.07.1996 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.06.1996 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
20.06.1996 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
20.06.1996 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
18.08.1995 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.08.1995 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.07.1995 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.07.1995 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
03.07.1995 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
24.03.1995 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
17.03.1995 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.12.1994 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.12.1994 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
96 |
|
12.12.1994 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.12.1993 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.11.1993 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.11.1993 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.11.1993 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.11.1993 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.11.1993 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.11.1993 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.11.1993 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.10.1993 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.10.1993 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
14.10.1993 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
14.10.1993 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.10.1993 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.07.1993 |
Annexes to the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
13.07.1993 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
13.07.1993 |
Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.02.1993 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
16.02.1993 |
Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.02.1993 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.02.1993 |
Enquiry with the International Bureau |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.01.1993 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
20.01.1993 |
Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.12.1992 |
Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.11.1992 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.10.1992 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
102 |
|
15.10.1992 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
34 |
|
15.10.1992 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
24 |
|
15.10.1992 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
38 |
|
15.10.1992 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
32 |
|
15.10.1992 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
46 |
|
23.06.1992 |
Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |