EP0589948 - METHOD FOR THE PREPARATION OF 3,4-DIHYDROXY-5-NITROBENZALDEHYDE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.07.1997 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.08.1997 [1997/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ORION-YHTYMÄ OY Orionintie 1, PL 65 02101 Espoo / FI | [N/P] |
Former [1994/14] | For all designated states ORION-YHTYMÄ OY Orionintie 1, PL 65 SF-02101 Espoo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HONKANEN, Erkki Koivusyrjä 7 F SF-02130 Espoo / FI | 02 /
LINDHOLM, Stig Kanervalantie 7 SF-02580 Siuntion asema / FI | [1996/36] |
Former [1994/14] | 01 /
HONKANEN, Erkki Koivusyrjä 7 F SF-02130 Espoo / FI | ||
02 /
LINDHOLM, Stig Näyttelijäntie 16 H 82 SF-00400 Helsinki / FI | Representative(s) | Sexton, Jane Helen, et al J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/14] | Sexton, Jane Helen, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 92911745.5 | 18.06.1992 | [1994/14] | WO1992FI00192 | Priority number, date | GB19910134312 | 20.06.1991 Original published format: GB 91134312 | [1994/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9300323 | Date: | 07.01.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0589948 | Date: | 06.04.1994 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.01.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0589948 | Date: | 04.09.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.01.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C07C205/44, C07C201/12 | [1994/14] | CPC: |
C07C201/12 (EP,KR,US);
C07C205/44 (KR)
| C-Set: |
C07C201/12, C07C205/44 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, SE [1994/14] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON 3,4-DIHYDROXY-5-NITROBENZALDEHYD | [1996/36] | English: | METHOD FOR THE PREPARATION OF 3,4-DIHYDROXY-5-NITROBENZALDEHYDE | [1994/14] | French: | PROCEDE DE PREPARATION DE 3,4-DIHYDROXY-5-NITROBENZALDEHYDE | [1994/14] |
Former [1994/14] | Verfahren zur Herstellung von 3,4-Dihydroxy-5-Nitrobenzaldehyd | Entry into regional phase | 13.12.1993 | National basic fee paid | 13.12.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.12.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.01.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 13.12.1993 | Examination requested [1994/14] | 17.10.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.03.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.06.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 03.06.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.06.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]GB2200109 (ORION YHTYMAE OY) | [Y] - SYNTHESIS. no. 3, 1976, STUTTGART DE pages 191 - 192; C. HANSSON ET AL.: 'Selective Dealkylation of Activated Aromatic Ethers.' | [A] - TETRAHEDRON LETTERS. no. 16, 1970, OXFORD GB pages 1327 - 1328; G.I. FEUTRILL ET AL.: 'Demethylation of Aryl Methyl Ethers with Thioethoxide ion in Dimethyl Formamide.' |