EP0586540 - POLYOL FATTY ACID POLYESTER COOKING MEDIUMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 02.07.1999 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.07.1999 | Opposition rejected | published on 18.08.1999 [1999/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1994/11] | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KESTER, Jeffrey, John 6704 Timberwood Drive West Chester, OH 45069 / US | 02 /
ELSEN, Joseph, James 2807 Montana Avenue Cincinnati, OH 45211 / US | 03 /
WEHMEIER, Thomas, Joseph 4179 Glenhaven Road Cincinnati, OH 45238 / US | 04 /
YOUNG, Jerry, Douglas 10589 Cranwood Court Cincinnati, Ohio 45240 / US | [1994/23] |
Former [1994/11] | 01 /
KESTER, Jeffrey, John 6704 Timberwood Drive West Chester, OH 45069 / US | ||
02 /
ELSEN, Joseph, James 2807 Montana Avenue Cincinnati, OH 45211 / US | |||
03 /
WEHMEIER, Thomas, Joseph 4179 Glenhaven Road Cincinnati, OH 45238 / US | |||
04 /
YOUNG, Jerry, Douglas 805 Ellison Avenue, Apt. 3 Cincinnati, OH 45226 / US | Representative(s) | Lawrence, Peter Robin Broughton, et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/15] | Lawrence, Peter Robin Broughton, et al GILL JENNINGS & EVERY, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | ||
Former [1994/11] | Canonici, Jean-Jacques Procter & Gamble European Technical Center N.V. Temselaan 100 B-1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | Application number, filing date | 92912495.6 | 15.05.1992 | [1994/11] | WO1992US03996 | Priority number, date | US19910705194 | 24.05.1991 Original published format: US 705194 | [1994/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9220237 | Date: | 26.11.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0586540 | Date: | 16.03.1994 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.11.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0586540 | Date: | 17.01.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.11.1992 | Classification | IPC: | A23D9/00, A23G3/00, A23P1/08 | [1994/11] | CPC: |
A23G3/343 (EP,US);
A23D9/013 (EP,US);
A23P20/11 (EP,US);
A23G2200/08 (EP,US);
Y10S426/804 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
A23G3/343, A23G2200/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1994/11] | Title | German: | POLYOL FETTSAÜREPOLYESTER ENTHALTENDE BACKÖLE | [1994/11] | English: | POLYOL FATTY ACID POLYESTER COOKING MEDIUMS | [1994/11] | French: | HUILES DE CUISSON PREPAREEES A PARTIR DE POLYESTERS D'ACIDES GRAS DE POLYOL | [1994/11] | Entry into regional phase | 11.12.1993 | National basic fee paid | 11.12.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.12.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.11.1992 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 13.12.1993 | Examination requested [1994/11] | 20.06.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.10.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.12.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.04.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.07.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 01.07.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
15.10.1996
ADMISSIBLE Unilever N.V., Rotterdam Patent Division Olivier van Noortlaan 120 Postbus 137 NL-3130 AC Vlaardingen / NL Opponent's representative Arbouw-Van der Veen, H.M.R. Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V., P.O. Box 3241 2280 GE Rijswijk / NL | [1996/50] | 25.11.1996 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 05.08.1997 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 04.03.1999 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [1999/33] | 04.03.1999 | Date of oral proceedings | 23.03.1999 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 23.03.1999 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JP62215598 ; | [A]EP0291106 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]); | [A]EP0375027 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]); | [XP]WO9115964 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) | [A] - CHEMISTRY AND PHYSICS OF LIPIDS vol. 22, 1978, pages 163 - 176; R.J. JANDACEK AND M.R. WEBB: 'PHYSICAL PROPERTIES OF PURE SUCROSE OCTAESTERS' cited in the application | [A] - WORLD PATENTS INDEX LATEST Section Ch, Week 8743, Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; Class D, AN 87-304341 & JP,A,62 215 598 (MITSUBISHI CHEM. IND. KK.) 22 September 1987, & JP62215598 A 19870922 |