EP0586579 - MICROWAVE PLASMA PROCESSING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1994/11] | WINDOW FOR MICROWAVE PLASMA PROCESSING DEVICE | ||
[1999/28] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.06.2001 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LAM RESEARCH CORPORATION 4650 Cushing Parkway Fremont, CA 94538-6401 / US | [1994/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHEN, Ching-Hwa 977 Westridge Drive Milpitas, CA 95035 / US | 02 /
PIRKLE, David 2588 Gary Drive Soquel, CA 95075 / US | 03 /
INOUE, Takashi 7-103, Koshien-cho 28 Ban Nishinomiya City, Hyogo 663 / JP | 04 /
MIYAHARA, Shunji 151-4, Ikenoue Gogazuka, Itami 664 / JP | 05 /
TANAKA, Masahiko 25-6-506, Kaminoshima-Cho 3 chome Amagasaki City 661 / JP | [1994/11] | Representative(s) | Woodcraft, David Charles, et al Brookes Batchellor 102-108 Clerkenwell Road London EC1M 5SA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/20] | Woodcraft, David Charles, et al BROOKES & MARTIN High Holborn House 52/54 High Holborn London, WC1V 6SE / GB | ||
Former [1995/18] | (deleted) | ||
Former [1994/11] | Diehl, Hermann, Dr. Dipl.-Phys. DIEHL, GLÄSER, HILTL & PARTNER Patentanwälte Flüggenstrasse 13 D-80639 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92913302.3 | 22.05.1992 | [1994/11] | WO1992US04338 | Priority number, date | US19910705523 | 24.05.1991 Original published format: US 705523 | [1994/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9222085 | Date: | 10.12.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0586579 | Date: | 16.03.1994 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.12.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0586579 | Date: | 30.08.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 10.12.1992 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.08.1994 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/00, C23C16/48, C23C16/50, H01J37/32 | [1994/41] | CPC: |
H01J37/32238 (EP,US);
H01J37/32192 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1994/11] | H01L21/00, C23C16/48, C23C16/50 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1994/11] | Title | German: | MIKROWELLENPLASMA-BEARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [1999/28] | English: | MICROWAVE PLASMA PROCESSING DEVICE | [1999/28] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT AU PLASMA A HYPERFREQUENCES | [1999/28] |
Former [1994/11] | FENSTER FÜR MIKROWELLENPLASMA-BEARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG | ||
Former [1994/11] | WINDOW FOR MICROWAVE PLASMA PROCESSING DEVICE | ||
Former [1994/11] | FENETRE POUR UN DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT AU PLASMA A HYPERFREQUENCES | Entry into regional phase | 23.11.1993 | National basic fee paid | 23.11.1993 | Search fee paid | 23.11.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.11.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.12.1992 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 23.11.1993 | Examination requested [1994/11] | 22.10.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.06.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 15.07.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.03.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.06.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.10.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.02.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.05.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 04.05.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.05.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/33] | Request for further processing for: | 15.07.1997 | Request for further processing filed | 15.07.1997 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 31.07.1997 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | |||
Former [2002/13] | DE | 01.12.2000 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US4510469 (BOWMAN DAVID F [US]) [X] 3 * column 1, line 4 - line 48 * * column 2, line 8 - line 44 * * column 4, line 48 - line 58; figures 1,2,8 * [A] 1,2,4-6,21,24-26,28,34; | [A]JPS6443950 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890606), vol. 13, no. 240, Database accession no. (E - 767), & JP01043950 A 19890216 (NTT) [A] 2,18,36 * abstract * | International search | [XY]JPH0390577 (HITACHI LTD, et al); | [XY]US4831963 (SAITO HIROSHI [JP], et al); | [XY]JPH027330 (TEL SAGAMI LTD); | [XY]JPH01307212 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP); | [Y]JPS61131450 (CANON KK, et al); | [XY]JPH0281434 (HITACHI LTD); | [Y]US4960973 (FOUCHE ALAIN [FR], et al) |