|
16.10.2002 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.07.2001 |
Miscellaneous requests concerning the applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.07.2001 |
Decision to allow further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.06.2001 |
Request for further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.06.2001 |
Request for further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.06.2001 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.04.2001 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (translations of claims/payment missing) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.02.2001 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.02.2001 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.02.2001 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
16.11.2000 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
16.11.2000 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
94 |
|
18.10.2000 |
Processing of grant of a patent after appeal (internal) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.10.2000 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.09.2000 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
18 |
|
19.07.2000 |
F3042 Dispatch of attendance note about a phone conversation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.07.2000 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
17.07.2000 |
Note of consultation between member and appellant / representative |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.06.2000 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
23.06.2000 |
Description |
Appeal |
5 |
|
23.06.2000 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
19.06.2000 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
12 |
|
11.05.2000 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.05.2000 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.04.2000 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.04.2000 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
7 |
|
13.04.2000 |
Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (ex parte) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.11.1998 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (ex parte) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.11.1998 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.11.1998 |
Communication of amended entries |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.11.1998 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.08.1998 |
Submission concerning representation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.08.1998 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
10 |
|
20.08.1998 |
Submission concerning representation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.07.1998 |
Document concerning appeal fee |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.06.1998 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.04.1998 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.04.1998 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
16.04.1998 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
16.04.1998 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.11.1997 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.10.1997 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
21.10.1997 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.09.1997 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.09.1997 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
25.07.1997 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.07.1997 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.05.1997 |
Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
26.03.1997 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.03.1997 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.03.1997 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
03.02.1997 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.01.1997 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.01.1997 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.09.1996 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
12.07.1996 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
12.07.1996 |
Description |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.07.1996 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
08.07.1996 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
10.05.1996 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.05.1996 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.01.1996 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.12.1995 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
13.11.1995 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
13.11.1995 |
Description |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
13.11.1995 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
29.09.1995 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.09.1995 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.05.1995 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
05.12.1994 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.12.1994 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.09.1994 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.09.1994 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.06.1994 |
Maintenance of the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.04.1994 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.04.1994 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
16 |
|
21.04.1994 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
21.04.1994 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
18 |
|
21.04.1994 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
21.04.1994 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
21.04.1994 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
16 |
|
21.04.1994 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
21.04.1994 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
21.04.1994 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
21.04.1994 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
21.04.1994 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
21.04.1994 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
21.04.1994 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
21.04.1994 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.04.1994 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
16.03.1994 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.02.1994 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.02.1994 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.02.1994 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.01.1994 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
26.01.1994 |
Description |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
26.01.1994 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.01.1994 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
26.02.1993 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.01.1993 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.01.1993 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
120 |
|
21.01.1993 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
36 |