EP0555443 - VISE-GRIP WRENCH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.03.1995 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.03.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.05.1995 [1995/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bessey & Sohn GmbH & Co. Mühlwiesenstrasse 40 D-74321 Bietigheim-Bissingen / DE | [1993/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KLIMACH, Horst Pfaffenhecke 8 D-7129 Ilsfeld-Auenstein / DE | 02 /
PHILIPP, Karl Schubertstrasse 131 D-7120 Bietigheim-Bissingen / DE | [1993/33] | Representative(s) | Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Uhlandstrasse 14c 70182 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/33] | Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Uhlandstrasse 14 c D-70182 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 92918180.8 | 27.08.1992 | [1993/33] | WO1992EP01971 | Priority number, date | DE19914128887 | 30.08.1991 Original published format: DE 4128887 | [1993/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9304822 | Date: | 18.03.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0555443 | Date: | 18.08.1993 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.03.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.03.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B25B7/12, B25B5/12, B25B5/16 | [1993/33] | CPC: |
B25B5/163 (EP);
B25B5/127 (EP);
B25B7/123 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [1993/33] | Title | German: | GRIPZANGE | [1993/33] | English: | VISE-GRIP WRENCH | [1993/33] | French: | PINCE-ETAU | [1993/33] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Entry into regional phase | 30.04.1993 | National basic fee paid | 30.04.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.04.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.04.1993 | Examination requested [1993/33] | 28.06.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.11.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/19] | 08.12.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1995/19] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.1994 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]DE3026285 ; | [Y]DE219055 ; | [Y]DE2806555 ; | [A]DE3152016 ; | [A]CH345621 ; | [A]DE3911334 ; | [A]FR476405 |