EP0599977 - HIV-TREATMENT METHOD WITH LOW-TOXICITY AMPHOTERICIN B [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 16.05.1997 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.05.1997 | Refusal of application | published on 02.07.1997 [1997/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SEQUUS PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. (a Delaware Corporation) 960 Hamilton Court Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1996/09] | For all designated states SEQUUS PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. (a Delaware Corporation) 960 Hamilton Court Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | ||
Former [1994/23] | For all designated states LIPOSOME TECHNOLOGY, INC. 1050 Hamilton Court Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARTIN, Francis J. 415 West Portal Avenue San Francisco, CA 94127 / US | 02 /
WOODLE, Martin C. 445 Oak Grove, 3 Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | 03 /
GUO, Luke S.S. 3452 Silver Spring Road Lafayette, CA 94549 / US | [1994/23] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/52] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Postfach 86 07 67 D-81634 München / DE | ||
Former [1994/23] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER P.O. Box 86 07 67 D-81634 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92918368.9 | 12.08.1992 | [1994/23] | WO1992US06788 | Priority number, date | US19910744915 | 14.08.1991 Original published format: US 744915 | [1994/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9303737 | Date: | 04.03.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0599977 | Date: | 08.06.1994 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.03.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.03.1993 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/71 | [1994/23] | CPC: |
A61K9/5115 (EP);
A61K31/7048 (EP);
A61K9/1617 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, SE [1994/23] | Title | German: | HIV BEHANDLUMG MIT AMPHOTERICIN B MIT NIEDRIGER TOXICITAET | [1994/23] | English: | HIV-TREATMENT METHOD WITH LOW-TOXICITY AMPHOTERICIN B | [1994/23] | French: | PROCEDE DE TRAITEMENT CONTRE LE VIH AVEC DE L'AMPHOTERICINE B A FAIBLE TOXICITE | [1994/23] | Entry into regional phase | 07.03.1994 | National basic fee paid | 07.03.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.03.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.03.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 07.03.1994 | Examination requested [1994/23] | 16.08.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 27.01.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1997/27] | 06.02.1997 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1997/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.08.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.08.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO8806450 (LIPOSOME TECHNOLOGY INC [US]); | [Y]WO8806443 (LIPOSOME CO INC [US]); | [Y]US5032404 (LOPEZ-BERESTEIN GABRIEL [US], et al) | [Y] - ANNALS OF THE NEW YORK ACADEMY OF SCIENCES vol. 618, 28 February 1991, pages 586 - 588 L.S. GUO ET AL. 'PHARMACOKINETIC STUDY OF A NOVEL AMPHOTERICIN B COLLOIDAL DISPERSION WITH IMPROVED THERAPEUTIC INDEX' | [Y] - THE JOURNAL OF INFECTIOUS DISEASES vol. 159, no. 4, 1989, pages 717 - 724 T.F. PATTERSON ET AL. 'TREATMENT OF EXPERIMENTAL INVASIVE ASPERGILLOSIS WITH NOVEL AMPHOTERICIN B/CHOLESTEROL-SULFATE COMPLEXES' | [Y] - ANTIMICROBIAL AGENTS AND CHEMOTHERAPY vol. 35, no. 6, June 1991, pages 1029 - 1034 S.W. SANDERS ET AL. 'SINGLE-DOSE PHARMACOKINETICS AND TOLERANCE OF A CHOLESTERYL SULFATE COMPLEX OF AMPHOTERICIN B ADMINISTERED TO HEALTHY VOLUNTEERS' | [Y] - CLINICAL RESEARCH vol. 36, no. 1, 1988, page 41A O. PRAKASH ET AL. 'TREATMENT OF HUMAN IMMUNODEFICIENCY VIRUS (HIV) INFECTION WITH AMPHOTERICIN B' | [Y] - ANTIVIRAL RESEARCH vol. 11, no. 3, 1989, pages 119 - 126 D.R. PONTANI ET AL. 'INHIBITION OF HIV REPLICATION BY LIPOSOMAL ENCAPSULATED AMPHOTERICIN B' | [YP] - INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICS vol. 75, no. 1, 30 August 1991, pages 45 - 54 L.S. GUO ET AL. 'NOVEL ANTIFUNGAL DRUG DELIVERY: STABLE AMPHOTERICINB-CHOLESTERYL SULFATE DISCS' | [YP] - THIRTY-FIRST INTERSCIENCE CONFERENCE ON ANTIMICROBIAL AGENTS AND CHEMOTHERAPY vol. 31, October 1991, CHICAGO,USA page 147 DE WIT ET AL. 'SAFETY, TOLERANCE AND IMMUNOMODULATORY EFFECT OF AMPHOTERICIN B LIPID COMPLEX (ABLC) IN HIV INFECTED SUBJECT(S)' |