EP0605473 - DEVICE FOR LOCKING A SLIDING BODY, AND PARTICULARLY A RETRACTABLE ROAD BOUNDERY-MARK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.10.1996 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.12.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 11.02.2004 [2004/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VERRA, Yvan 75, rue Folard F-84310 MORIERES / FR | [1994/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1994/28] | Representative(s) | Bugnon-Hays, Claudine PATCO S.A. 39, avenue René Cassin B.P.4 84170 Monteux / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1994/28] | Bugnon-Hays, Claudine PATCO S.A. 39, avenue René Cassin B.P.4 F-84170 Monteux / FR | Application number, filing date | 92919043.7 | 27.08.1992 | [1994/28] | WO1992FR00825 | Priority number, date | FR19910011092 | 05.09.1991 Original published format: FR 9111092 | [1994/28] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9305235 | Date: | 18.03.1993 | Language: | FR | [1993/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0605473 | Date: | 13.07.1994 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.03.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0605473 | Date: | 20.12.1995 | Language: | FR | [1995/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.03.1993 | Classification | IPC: | E01F13/00, E05B63/24 | [1994/28] | CPC: |
E05B63/248 (EP,US);
E01F13/046 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1994/28] | Title | German: | EINRICHTUNG ZUR VERRIEGELUNG EINES SCHIEBBAREN ELEMENTS, INSBESONDERE EINES VERSENKBAREN POLLERS | [1994/28] | English: | DEVICE FOR LOCKING A SLIDING BODY, AND PARTICULARLY A RETRACTABLE ROAD BOUNDERY-MARK | [1994/28] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR LE VERROUILLAGE D'UN CORPS COULISSANT ET, EN PARTICULIER, D'UNE BORNE DE VOIRIE RETRACTABLE | [1994/28] | Entry into regional phase | 17.02.1994 | National basic fee paid | 17.02.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.02.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.03.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 17.02.1994 | Examination requested [1994/28] | 25.04.1995 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 24.05.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.05.1995 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 23.06.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.09.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 15.09.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.09.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.08.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Licence(s) | ID: | 01 00/exclusive | For: | all designated states | Licencee: | URBACO, Société Anonyme Z.I. de Chanlençon 2 84270 Vedene / FR | Date: | 14.09.1995 | [1995/46] | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DK | 20.12.1995 | GR | 20.12.1995 | SE | 20.03.1996 | [2004/07] |
Former [1998/15] | DK | 20.12.1995 | |
SE | 20.03.1996 | ||
Former [1996/32] | SE | 20.03.1996 | Cited in | International search | [A]US1574908 (LAMP FRED C); | [A]EP0211688 (RILEY WILLIAM T); | [A]EP0227447 (GREEST G C J ESQ); | [X]FR2621625 (CLAPIER GEORGES [FR], et al); | [Y]GB2210091 (BAILEY ERIC CLAUD); | [A]EP0369860 (AVIGNON COLLECTIVITE [FR]); | [A]EP0380884 (HIGGINSON BARRY [GB], et al); | [A]FR2644809 (CLAPIER GEORGES [FR], et al); | [A]DE4030458 (COLOMBO GIORGIO [IT]); | [Y]EP0432067 (5 THESE IND SA [FR]); | [A]DE9105297U |