|
07.07.2004 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.07.2004 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.07.2003 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.12.2002 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.12.2002 |
Reply to communication about intention to grant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.12.2002 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
02.12.2002 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
02.12.2002 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
02.12.2002 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
27.11.2002 |
Reply to communication about intention to grant |
Search / examination |
30 |
|
28.08.2002 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.08.2002 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.08.2002 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.08.2002 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.08.2002 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.04.2002 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
16.04.2002 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
57 |
|
04.04.2002 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.08.2001 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
24.08.2001 |
Description |
Search / examination |
40 |
|
24.08.2001 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.08.2001 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
59 |
|
02.07.2001 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.06.2001 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.06.2001 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.02.2001 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.12.2000 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.11.2000 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.11.2000 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.11.2000 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.07.2000 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.06.2000 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
29 |
|
28.06.2000 |
F3314 Oral proceedings: Minutes (ex parte) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.06.2000 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.06.2000 |
Request for change of name of the applicant |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
30.05.2000 |
Claims |
Appeal |
11 |
|
30.05.2000 |
Claims |
Appeal |
9 |
|
30.05.2000 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
10.02.2000 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.02.2000 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.02.2000 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
4 |
|
02.02.2000 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.01.2000 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.01.2000 |
Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.01.2000 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
07.01.2000 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.01.2000 |
Claims |
Appeal |
16 |
|
07.01.2000 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.12.1999 |
Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
29.12.1999 |
Request for assignment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.08.1999 |
Claims |
Appeal |
16 |
|
02.08.1999 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.06.1997 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.06.1997 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (ex parte) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.04.1997 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
11.04.1997 |
Claims |
Appeal |
15 |
|
11.04.1997 |
Claims |
Appeal |
10 |
|
11.04.1997 |
Claims |
Appeal |
60 |
|
11.04.1997 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.04.1997 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
13 |
|
11.04.1997 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
27 |
|
11.04.1997 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
19 |
|
11.04.1997 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
55 |
|
11.04.1997 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
21 |
|
11.04.1997 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
25 |
|
11.04.1997 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
17 |
|
01.04.1997 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
97 |
|
20.01.1997 |
Document concerning appeal fee |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.01.1997 |
Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.01.1997 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.11.1996 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.11.1996 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.11.1996 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
07.06.1996 |
Decision to allow further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.05.1996 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.05.1996 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
74 |
|
24.05.1996 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
21.05.1996 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
32 |
|
27.03.1996 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.03.1996 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.03.1996 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.12.1995 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.12.1995 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.12.1995 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.08.1995 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.01.1995 |
Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.12.1994 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.09.1994 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.07.1994 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.07.1994 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.06.1994 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.06.1994 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
04.06.1994 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
69 |
|
04.06.1994 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.06.1994 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
15.02.1994 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
15.02.1994 |
Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.07.1993 |
Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.07.1993 |
Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.06.1993 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.06.1993 |
Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.06.1993 |
Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.06.1993 |
Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.06.1993 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
357 |
|
10.11.1992 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
224 |