|
26.06.2013 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.10.2008 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.02.2005 |
Closing of application |
Opposition |
3 |
|
08.02.2005 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
37 |
|
24.01.2005 |
Letter Boards of Appeal, with label space |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.01.2005 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.12.2004 |
Request concerning the applicant/representative |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.11.2004 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
11 |
|
03.11.2004 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
5 |
|
25.10.2004 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
5 |
|
22.10.2004 |
Claims |
Appeal |
6 |
|
22.10.2004 |
Claims |
Appeal |
6 |
|
22.10.2004 |
Claims |
Appeal |
6 |
|
22.10.2004 |
Claims |
Appeal |
6 |
|
22.10.2004 |
Claims |
Appeal |
6 |
|
22.10.2004 |
Claims |
Appeal |
6 |
|
22.10.2004 |
Claims |
Appeal |
5 |
|
22.10.2004 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
22.10.2004 |
Claims |
Appeal |
6 |
|
22.10.2004 |
Claims |
Appeal |
6 |
|
22.10.2004 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
22.10.2004 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
22.10.2004 |
Claims |
Appeal |
6 |
|
22.10.2004 |
Claims |
Appeal |
6 |
|
22.10.2004 |
Claims |
Appeal |
6 |
|
22.10.2004 |
Claims |
Appeal |
6 |
|
22.10.2004 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
22.10.2004 |
Claims |
Appeal |
5 |
|
22.10.2004 |
Claims |
Appeal |
6 |
|
22.10.2004 |
Claims |
Appeal |
5 |
|
22.10.2004 |
Claims |
Appeal |
5 |
|
22.10.2004 |
Claims |
Appeal |
6 |
|
22.10.2004 |
Claims |
Appeal |
6 |
|
22.10.2004 |
Claims |
Appeal |
6 |
|
22.10.2004 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
5 |
|
22.10.2004 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
5 |
|
22.10.2004 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
5 |
|
22.10.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.10.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
22 |
|
21.10.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.10.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.10.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
15.10.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
82 |
|
15.10.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
11 |
|
14.10.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
11 |
|
08.10.2004 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
5 |
|
24.09.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.09.2004 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
4 |
|
10.09.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.08.2004 |
Letter Boards of Appeal, with label space |
Appeal |
6 |
|
23.07.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.07.2004 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
5 |
|
21.07.2004 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
5 |
|
13.07.2004 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.07.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.07.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.07.2004 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.07.2004 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.07.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.07.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.07.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.07.2004 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.07.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.07.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.07.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.06.2004 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.06.2004 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
15 |
|
28.06.2004 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.10.2003 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
5 |
|
09.10.2003 |
Annex |
Appeal |
7 |
|
09.10.2003 |
Annex |
Appeal |
3 |
|
09.10.2003 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
18 |
|
09.10.2003 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
22 |
|
02.10.2003 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
19 |
|
01.10.2003 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
19 |
|
23.09.2003 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
6 |
|
05.09.2003 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.09.2003 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
01.09.2003 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Appeal |
34 |
|
29.08.2003 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
5 |
|
28.08.2003 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
5 |
|
25.08.2003 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.08.2003 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
19 |
|
11.08.2003 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
22 |
|
09.05.2003 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
6 |
|
29.04.2003 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.04.2003 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
6 |
|
22.04.2003 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.04.2003 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.04.2003 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.04.2003 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.03.2003 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.03.2003 |
Letter Boards of Appeal, with label space |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.02.2003 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.02.2003 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.02.2003 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
5 |
|
12.02.2003 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.02.2003 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.02.2003 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
5 |
|
23.01.2003 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.01.2003 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
17.01.2003 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
5 |
|
14.01.2003 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
5 |
|
07.01.2003 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.01.2003 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
17.12.2002 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.12.2002 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
09.12.2002 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
6 |
|
28.11.2002 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.11.2002 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.11.2002 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.11.2002 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.11.2002 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
5 |
|
30.10.2002 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.10.2002 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.10.2002 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
5 |
|
17.10.2002 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.10.2002 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
5 |
|
17.10.2002 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.10.2002 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.10.2002 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
38 |
|
14.10.2002 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
14.10.2002 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
19 |
|
14.10.2002 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
34 |
|
14.10.2002 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
14.10.2002 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.10.2002 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
109 |
|
14.10.2002 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
15 |
|
14.10.2002 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.10.2002 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
28 |
|
14.10.2002 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
38 |
|
14.10.2002 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
36 |
|
11.10.2002 |
Annex |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.10.2002 |
Annex |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.10.2002 |
Claims |
Appeal |
6 |
|
11.10.2002 |
Claims |
Appeal |
6 |
|
11.10.2002 |
Claims |
Appeal |
6 |
|
11.10.2002 |
Claims |
Appeal |
6 |
|
11.10.2002 |
Claims |
Appeal |
6 |
|
11.10.2002 |
Claims |
Appeal |
6 |
|
11.10.2002 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.10.2002 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
11.10.2002 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
11.10.2002 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.10.2002 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
11.10.2002 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
12 |
|
11.10.2002 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
19 |
|
11.10.2002 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
42 |
|
11.10.2002 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
16 |
|
11.10.2002 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.10.2002 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
11.10.2002 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.10.2002 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
11.10.2002 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
11.10.2002 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
11.10.2002 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
11.10.2002 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
11.10.2002 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
11.10.2002 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
11.10.2002 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
11.10.2002 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
11.10.2002 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
19 |
|
11.10.2002 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
11.10.2002 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
11.10.2002 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
11.10.2002 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
11.10.2002 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
11.10.2002 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
11.10.2002 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
12 |
|
11.10.2002 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
19 |
|
11.10.2002 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
11.10.2002 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
11.10.2002 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
11.10.2002 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
38 |
|
11.10.2002 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
28 |
|
11.10.2002 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
36 |
|
10.10.2002 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
16.08.2002 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.08.2002 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.08.2002 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.06.2002 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.06.2002 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.06.2002 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.06.2002 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.06.2002 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.06.2002 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.06.2002 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.06.2002 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.06.2002 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.06.2002 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.06.2002 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.06.2002 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
8 |
|
03.06.2002 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.06.2002 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.06.2002 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.06.2002 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.06.2002 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.06.2002 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.06.2002 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
23 |
|
11.07.2001 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
3 |
|
11.07.2001 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
8 |
|
11.07.2001 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
15 |
|
11.07.2001 |
Documents for the maintenance of the patent as amended |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.07.2001 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.04.2001 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.03.2001 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.03.2001 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.03.2001 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.03.2001 |
Annex |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.03.2001 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
19.03.2001 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.03.2001 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
5 |
|
19.03.2001 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.03.2001 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
16 |
|
13.03.2001 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
13.03.2001 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.03.2001 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
09.03.2001 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
09.03.2001 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
09.03.2001 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.03.2001 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
7 |
|
06.03.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.03.2001 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
19 |
|
26.02.2001 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.02.2001 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
26.02.2001 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.02.2001 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.02.2001 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.02.2001 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.02.2001 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
10.02.2001 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.02.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.02.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.02.2001 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
7 |
|
05.02.2001 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.01.2001 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
31.01.2001 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.01.2001 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
26 |
|
29.01.2001 |
Claims |
Opposition |
7 |
|
29.01.2001 |
Claims |
Opposition |
7 |
|
29.01.2001 |
Claims |
Opposition |
7 |
|
29.01.2001 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
29.01.2001 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
29.01.2001 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
46 |
|
29.01.2001 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
17 |
|
29.01.2001 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
29.01.2001 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
29.01.2001 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
29.01.2001 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
137 |
|
29.01.2001 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
29.01.2001 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
29.01.2001 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
54 |
|
29.01.2001 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
29.01.2001 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
59 |
|
29.01.2001 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
29.01.2001 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
29.01.2001 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.01.2001 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
67 |
|
29.01.2001 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
29.01.2001 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
26 |
|
29.01.2001 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
30 |
|
29.01.2001 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
78 |
|
29.01.2001 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
29.01.2001 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
29.01.2001 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
13 |
|
29.01.2001 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.01.2001 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
32 |
|
29.01.2001 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
29.01.2001 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
31 |
|
25.01.2001 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.01.2001 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.01.2001 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.07.2000 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.07.2000 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.07.2000 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.07.2000 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.07.2000 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.07.2000 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.07.2000 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.07.2000 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.07.2000 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.07.2000 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.07.2000 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.07.2000 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.07.2000 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
6 |
|
11.07.2000 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
14 |
|
11.07.2000 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.07.2000 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.07.2000 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.07.2000 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.07.2000 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.07.2000 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.07.2000 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.06.2000 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.06.2000 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.06.2000 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.06.2000 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.06.2000 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.06.2000 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.05.2000 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.05.2000 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.05.2000 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.05.2000 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.05.2000 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.05.2000 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.05.2000 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.05.2000 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.08.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.08.1999 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.06.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.06.1999 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
24.06.1999 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
24.06.1999 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
24.06.1999 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
24.06.1999 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
24.06.1999 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
26 |
|
24.06.1999 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
66 |
|
22.06.1999 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
66 |
|
10.05.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.05.1999 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.04.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.04.1999 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.04.1999 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.04.1999 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.02.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.02.1999 |
Communication of amended entries |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.02.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.02.1999 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.02.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.02.1999 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.02.1999 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.02.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.02.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.02.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.02.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.02.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.02.1999 |
Communication of amended entries |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.02.1999 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.02.1999 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.01.1999 |
General authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.01.1999 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.01.1999 |
Invitation to give notice of appointment of a professional representative and to file an authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.01.1999 |
Annex |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.01.1999 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.01.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.01.1999 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.01.1999 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.12.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.12.1998 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.12.1998 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.12.1998 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.10.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.10.1998 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.10.1998 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.10.1998 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.06.1998 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.06.1998 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.06.1998 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.06.1998 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.06.1998 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.06.1998 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.06.1998 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.06.1998 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.06.1998 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.06.1998 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
02.06.1998 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
02.06.1998 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
80 |
|
02.06.1998 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
66 |
|
02.06.1998 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
28.05.1998 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.05.1998 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.05.1998 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
15.05.1998 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.05.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.05.1998 |
N/A |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.05.1998 |
N/A |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.05.1998 |
N/A |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.05.1998 |
N/A |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.05.1998 |
N/A |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.05.1998 |
Request for documents |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.05.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.05.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.05.1998 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.05.1998 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.05.1998 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.05.1998 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
04.05.1998 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
04.05.1998 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
04.05.1998 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
17 |
|
04.05.1998 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
04.05.1998 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
04.05.1998 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
04.05.1998 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
04.05.1998 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
37 |
|
04.05.1998 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
35 |
|
04.05.1998 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
82 |
|
04.05.1998 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
66 |
|
04.05.1998 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
101 |
|
30.04.1998 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.04.1998 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.04.1998 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.04.1998 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
27.04.1998 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
27.04.1998 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
27.04.1998 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
26 |
|
27.04.1998 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
27.04.1998 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
21 |
|
27.04.1998 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
27.04.1998 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
27.04.1998 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
27.04.1998 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
27.04.1998 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
27.04.1998 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
27.04.1998 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
27.04.1998 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
27.04.1998 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
27.04.1998 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
45 |
|
27.04.1998 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
27.04.1998 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
51 |
|
27.04.1998 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
50 |
|
27.04.1998 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
61 |
|
27.04.1998 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
27.04.1998 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
34 |
|
27.04.1998 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
58 |
|
27.04.1998 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
34 |
|
24.04.1998 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.04.1998 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
20 |
|
24.04.1998 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
23.04.1998 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.04.1998 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
23.04.1998 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
23.04.1998 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
23.04.1998 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
23.04.1998 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
23.04.1998 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
23.04.1998 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
23.04.1998 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
23.04.1998 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
23.04.1998 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
23.04.1998 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
23.04.1998 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.04.1998 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
23.04.1998 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
23.04.1998 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
23.04.1998 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
82 |
|
23.04.1998 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
23.04.1998 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
23.04.1998 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
23.04.1998 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
23.04.1998 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
23.04.1998 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
23.04.1998 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
19 |
|
23.04.1998 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
35 |
|
23.04.1998 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
45 |
|
23.04.1998 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
23.04.1998 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
38 |
|
23.04.1998 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
22.04.1998 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
22.04.1998 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
22.04.1998 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
22.04.1998 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
22.04.1998 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
10 |
|
22.04.1998 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
22.04.1998 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
80 |
|
22.04.1998 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
33 |
|
22.04.1998 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
64 |
|
26.11.1997 |
Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.11.1997 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.11.1997 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.11.1997 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.06.1997 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.05.1997 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.05.1997 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.05.1997 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.05.1997 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.05.1997 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.04.1997 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.04.1997 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.04.1997 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
23.04.1997 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
27.01.1997 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
21.01.1997 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.01.1997 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.01.1997 |
Disapproval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.01.1997 |
Disapproval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.11.1996 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.11.1996 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
127 |
|
08.10.1996 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.08.1996 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.08.1996 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.08.1996 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.08.1996 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.07.1996 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
18.07.1996 |
Description |
Search / examination |
71 |
|
18.07.1996 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.05.1996 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
09.05.1996 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.01.1996 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.01.1996 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.01.1996 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
12.01.1996 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.01.1996 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
12.01.1996 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.01.1996 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
27.09.1995 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
26.08.1995 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.08.1995 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
28.07.1995 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.05.1995 |
General enquiry |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.03.1995 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.07.1994 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.07.1994 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.07.1994 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.06.1994 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
31.05.1994 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.05.1994 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
31.05.1994 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
31.05.1994 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
31.05.1994 |
Written request for examination |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.05.1994 |
Written request for examination |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
26.05.1994 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
17.02.1994 |
Annexes to the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
17.02.1994 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
17.02.1994 |
Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.11.1993 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
09.11.1993 |
Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.08.1993 |
Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.06.1993 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.05.1993 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
162 |
|
13.05.1993 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
110 |
|
13.05.1993 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
106 |
|
13.05.1993 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
80 |