EP0575572 - STABLE SALTS OF (+)-(1S,2R)-2- N-(2-HYDROXYLAMINO-2-OXOETHYL)-N-METHYL-AMINO CARBONYL CYCLOHEXANE-1-CARBOXYLIC ACID, PROCESS FOR THEIR PREPARATION AND PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING THEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1993/52] | STABLE SALTS OF (+)-(1S,2R)-2- N-(2-HYDROXYLAMINO-2-OXOETHYL)-N-METHYL-AMINO]CARBONYL]CYCLOHEXANE-1-CARBOXYLIC ACID, PROCESS FOR THEIR PREPARATION AND PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING THEM | ||
[2007/46] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 09.08.1996 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2007 | Change - German title | published on 14.11.2007 [2007/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LABORATORI GUIDOTTI S.P.A. Via Trieste 40 56100 Pisa / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1993/52] | For all designated states Laboratori Guidotti S.p.A. Via Trieste 40 I-56100 Pisa / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GIORGI, Raffaello Viale Delle Piagge, 9 I-56100 Pisa / IT | 02 /
SUBISSI, Alessandro Località "Le Pescine", 5 - Calci I-56010 Pisa / IT | 03 /
TURBANTI, Luigi Via N. Sauro, 5/A I-56123 Pisa / IT | [1993/52] | Representative(s) | Dragotti, Gianfranco Dragotti & Associati Srl Via Nino Bixio, 7 20129 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1995/44] | Dragotti, Gianfranco SAIC BREVETTI s.r.l. Galleria San Babila, 4/D I-20122 Milano / IT | ||
Former [1993/52] | Dragotti, Gianfranco SAIC BREVETTI s.r.l. Galleria San Babila, 4/D I-20122 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 92924726.0 | 12.12.1992 | [1993/52] | WO1992EP02903 | Priority number, date | IT1991MI00344 | 23.12.1991 Original published format: IT MI91344 | [1993/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9313056 | Date: | 08.07.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0575572 | Date: | 29.12.1993 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.07.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.07.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C07C259/06, A61K31/16 | [1993/52] | CPC: |
C07D231/12 (EP);
A61P9/12 (EP);
C07C229/26 (EP);
C07C259/06 (EP);
C07D233/56 (EP);
C07D249/08 (EP);
C07C2601/14 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1993/52] | Title | German: | Stabile Salze von (+)-(IS,2R)-2- N-(2-Hydroxylamino-2-oxoäthyl)N-methylamino carbonyl cyklohexan-1-carbonsäure | [2007/46] | English: | STABLE SALTS OF (+)-(1S,2R)-2- N-(2-HYDROXYLAMINO-2-OXOETHYL)-N-METHYL-AMINO CARBONYL CYCLOHEXANE-1-CARBOXYLIC ACID, PROCESS FOR THEIR PREPARATION AND PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING THEM | [2007/46] | French: | SELS STABLES DE L'ACIDE (+)-(1S,2R)-2- N-(2-HYDROXYLAMINO-2-OXOETHYL)-N-METHYL-AMINO CARBONYL CYCLOHEXANE-1-CARBOXYLIQUE, PROCEDE DE PREPARATION ET COMPOSITIONS PHARMACEUTIQUES LES CONTENANT | [2007/46] |
Former [1993/52] | Stabile Salze von (+)-(IS,2R)-2-[[N-(2-Hydroxylamino-2-oxoäthyl)N-methylamino]carbonyl]cyklohexan-1-carbonsäure | ||
Former [1993/52] | STABLE SALTS OF (+)-(1S,2R)-2- N-(2-HYDROXYLAMINO-2-OXOETHYL)-N-METHYL-AMINO]CARBONYL]CYCLOHEXANE-1-CARBOXYLIC ACID, PROCESS FOR THEIR PREPARATION AND PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING THEM | ||
Former [1993/52] | SELS STABLES DE L'ACIDE (+)-(1S,2R)-2- N-(2-HYDROXYLAMINO-2-OXOETHYL)-N-METHYL-AMINO]CARBONYL]CYCLOHEXANE-1-CARBOXYLIQUE, PROCEDE DE PREPARATION ET COMPOSITIONS PHARMACEUTIQUES LES CONTENANT | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Entry into regional phase | 20.08.1993 | National basic fee paid | 20.08.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.03.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.03.1994 | Examination requested [1994/21] | 16.05.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.10.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 22.12.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.05.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 26.07.1996 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1996/39] | Request for further processing for: | 04.01.1996 | Request for further processing filed | 17.11.1995 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 08.02.1996 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 15.02.1994 | M01   Fee paid on   09.03.1994 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0337348 (GUIDOTTI & C SPA LABOR [IT]) |