blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0552800

EP0552800 - Thin metallic sheet for shadow mask [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  07.02.1997
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip07.02.1997No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 26.03.1997 [1997/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NKK CORPORATION
1-2, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-0005 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1993/30]For all designated states
NKK CORPORATION
1-2, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Inoue, Tadashi, c/o Patent and License Department
NKK Corporation, 1-1 Minamiwatarido-cho
Kawasaki-ku, Kawasaki 210 / JP
02 / Yoshizawa, Hidekazu, c/o Patent and License Dept.
NKK Corporation, 1-1 Minamiwatarido-cho
Kawasaki-ku, Kawasaki 210 / JP
03 / Tsuru, Kiyoshi, c/o Patent and License Department
NKK Corporation, 1-1 Minamiwatarido-cho
Kawasaki-ku, Kawasaki 210 / JP
04 / Okita, Tomoyoshi, c/o Patent and License Dept.
NKK Corporation, 1-1 Minamiwatarido-cho
Kawasaki-ku, Kawasaki 210 / JP
05 / Shimiz, Yoshiaki, c/o Patent and License Dept.
NKK Corporation, 1-1 Minamiwatarido-cho
Kawasaki-ku, Kawasaki 210 / JP
[1993/30]
Representative(s)Hansen, Bernd, et al
Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 81 04 20
81904 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1993/30]Hansen, Bernd, Dr. Dipl.-Chem., et al
Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20
D-81904 München / DE
Application number, filing date93100970.822.01.1993
[1993/30]
Priority number, dateJP1992003293924.01.1992         Original published format: JP 3293992
JP1992004071431.01.1992         Original published format: JP 4071492
[1993/30]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0552800
Date:28.07.1993
Language:EN
[1993/30]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0552800
Date:03.04.1996
Language:EN
[1996/14]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.03.1993
ClassificationIPC:H01J29/07, H01J9/14
[1993/30]
CPC:
C22C38/08 (EP,US); H01J29/07 (EP,US); H01J9/142 (EP,US);
H01J2229/0733 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE [1995/42]
Former [1993/30]DE,  FR 
TitleGerman:Dünnes Metallblech für Schattenmaske[1993/30]
English:Thin metallic sheet for shadow mask[1993/30]
French:Feuille métallique mince pour masque d'ombre[1993/30]
Examination procedure22.01.1993Examination requested  [1993/30]
25.01.1995Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.06.1995Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.06.1995Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
01.09.1995Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.11.1995Fee for grant paid
08.11.1995Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)04.01.1997No opposition filed within time limit [1997/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.01.1995Renewal fee patent year 03
31.01.1996Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0222560  (TOSHIBA KK [JP]);
 [A]EP0104453  (TOSHIBA KK [JP]);
 [A]DE3636815  (NIPPON MINING CO [JP])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.