|
03.03.2016 |
CDS Clean up - amended applicant details |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.11.2009 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.11.2009 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.11.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.11.2009 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.11.2009 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
12 |
|
31.08.2009 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
4 |
|
24.08.2009 |
F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.08.2009 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.07.2009 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.07.2009 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
14 |
|
19.06.2009 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.06.2009 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.06.2009 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.05.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.05.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.05.2009 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.05.2009 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
6 |
|
19.05.2009 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.12.2008 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.12.2008 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
03.12.2008 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.12.2008 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
03.12.2008 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.11.2008 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.10.2008 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.10.2008 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.09.2008 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.09.2008 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.09.2008 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.06.2008 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.05.2008 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.04.2008 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.04.2008 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.04.2008 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
11.04.2008 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
11.04.2008 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
11.04.2008 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
11.04.2008 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
26 |
|
11.04.2008 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
11.04.2008 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
8 |
|
09.04.2008 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
13 |
|
17.03.2008 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.02.2008 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
01.02.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.01.2008 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.01.2008 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.01.2008 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.01.2008 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.01.2008 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's name |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.01.2008 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.01.2008 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (with time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.01.2008 |
Communication about missing advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.11.2007 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.11.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.11.2007 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
4 |
|
29.11.2007 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
7 |
|
29.11.2007 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.11.2007 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.11.2007 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.11.2007 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.11.2007 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.11.2007 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.11.2007 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
29.11.2007 |
Text intended for grant |
Opposition |
11 |
|
21.11.2007 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.10.2007 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
3 |
|
23.10.2007 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
4 |
|
23.10.2007 |
Documents for the maintenance of the patent as amended |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.10.2007 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.10.2007 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.10.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.10.2007 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
11.10.2007 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
11.10.2007 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.10.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.10.2007 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
09.10.2007 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
09.10.2007 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
31.08.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.08.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.08.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.08.2007 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
23.08.2007 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
17.08.2007 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
17.08.2007 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
17.08.2007 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
08.05.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.04.2007 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.04.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.04.2007 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.03.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.03.2007 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.03.2007 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
8 |
|
26.03.2007 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.03.2007 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.03.2007 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.12.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.11.2005 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
9 |
|
17.10.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.10.2005 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.10.2005 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.10.2005 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.10.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.09.2005 |
Request for change of representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.08.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.08.2005 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.08.2005 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.08.2005 |
Communication of amended entries |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2005 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.07.2005 |
Request for change of representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.07.2005 |
Request for change of representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.07.2005 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.07.2005 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.06.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.06.2005 |
Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.06.2005 |
Request for transfer of rights |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.03.2005 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.03.2005 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.03.2005 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.02.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.02.2005 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.02.2005 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
14.02.2005 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
13 |
|
14.02.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
14.02.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
14.02.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
31 |
|
14.02.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
40 |
|
14.02.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
19 |
|
14.02.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
14.02.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
23 |
|
14.02.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
14.02.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
14.02.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
24 |
|
11.02.2005 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
13 |
|
11.02.2005 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
01.04.2004 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.02.2004 |
Approval of request for amendments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.02.2004 |
Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.11.2003 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent until 31.03.2012 |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.11.2003 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
14.11.2003 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
31.07.2003 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.07.2003 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
31.07.2003 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
29 |
|
28.09.1998 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.08.1998 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
28.08.1998 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
24.07.1998 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.07.1998 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.03.1998 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.10.1997 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the applicant/patent proprietor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.10.1997 |
Request for assignment |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
16.10.1997 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.09.1997 |
Request for assignment |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
25.03.1994 |
Written request for examination |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.06.1993 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.06.1993 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
26.03.1993 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.03.1993 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
26.03.1993 |
Description |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
26.03.1993 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.03.1993 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.03.1993 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
28 |
|
26.03.1993 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
6 |