EP0568104 - Pyrolysis and combustion installation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 11.11.2000 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2005 | Change: Appeal number | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KIV Kovinska Industrija Vransko d.o.o. 63305 Vransko / SI | [N/P] |
Former [1993/44] | For all designated states KIV KOVINSKA INDUSTRIA VRANSKO d.o.o. 63305 Vransko / SI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Remic, Marjan Tesova 12 SL-63305 Vransko / SI | 02 /
Zeleznik, Franc Sempeter 115 B SL-63311 Sempeter / SI | [1993/44] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J., et al Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/12] | Goddar, Heinz J., Dr., et al FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 80801 München / DE | ||
Former [1993/44] | Goddar, Heinz J., Dr. FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 D-80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 93107087.4 | 30.04.1993 | [1993/44] | Priority number, date | SI19920000068 | 30.04.1992 Original published format: SI 9200068 | [1993/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0568104 | Date: | 03.11.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0568104 | Date: | 15.12.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0568104 | Date: | 19.03.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.10.1993 | Classification | IPC: | F23G5/027, F23G7/06, F23G5/50, F23L15/00, F23J1/00, F23M5/08 | [1993/44] | CPC: |
F23G7/065 (EP);
F23G5/027 (EP);
F23J1/00 (EP);
F23G2201/303 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1993/44] | Title | German: | Verschwel- und Verbrennungsanlage | [1993/44] | English: | Pyrolysis and combustion installation | [1993/44] | French: | Installation de pyrolyse et de combustion | [1993/44] | Examination procedure | 17.05.1994 | Examination requested [1994/29] | 21.06.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.10.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.04.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.09.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.12.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 13.12.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
12.12.1997
20.01.1998
ADMISSIBLE Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/07] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
12.12.1997
Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 D-80506 München / DE | 23.01.1998 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 23.07.1998 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 16.04.1999 | Date of oral proceedings | 04.05.1999 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 04.05.1999 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 28.10.2000 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2000/52] | Appeal following opposition | 29.04.1999 | Appeal received No. T0483/99 | 09.10.2000 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent deemed not to be filed | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 18.06.1993 | AT   M01   Fee paid on   16.07.1993 | 18.06.1993 | BE   M01   Fee paid on   16.07.1993 | 18.06.1993 | CH   M01   Fee paid on   16.07.1993 | 18.06.1993 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   16.07.1993 | 18.06.1993 | DK   M01   Fee paid on   16.07.1993 | 18.06.1993 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   16.07.1993 | 18.06.1993 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   16.07.1993 | 18.06.1993 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   16.07.1993 | 18.06.1993 | GR   M01   Fee paid on   16.07.1993 | 18.06.1993 | IE   M01   Fee paid on   16.07.1993 | 18.06.1993 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   16.07.1993 | 18.06.1993 | LI   M01   Not yet paid | 18.06.1993 | LU   M01   Fee paid on   16.07.1993 | 18.06.1993 | MC   M01   Fee paid on   16.07.1993 | 18.06.1993 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   16.07.1993 | 18.06.1993 | PT   M01   Fee paid on   16.07.1993 | 18.06.1993 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 30.04.1998 | DK | 30.04.1998 | GR | 30.04.1998 | IE | 30.04.1998 | LI | 30.04.1998 | LU | 30.04.1998 | SE | 01.05.1998 | ES | 04.05.1998 | MC | 31.10.1998 | PT | 31.10.1998 | NL | 01.11.1998 | [2004/37] |
Former [2004/09] | CH | 30.04.1998 | |
DK | 30.04.1998 | ||
GR | 30.04.1998 | ||
IE | 30.04.1998 | ||
LI | 30.04.1998 | ||
LU | 30.04.1998 | ||
SE | 01.05.1998 | ||
MC | 31.10.1998 | ||
PT | 31.10.1998 | ||
NL | 01.11.1998 | ||
ES | 16.07.2000 | ||
Former [2003/45] | CH | 30.04.1998 | |
DK | 30.04.1998 | ||
IE | 30.04.1998 | ||
LI | 30.04.1998 | ||
LU | 30.04.1998 | ||
SE | 01.05.1998 | ||
MC | 31.10.1998 | ||
PT | 31.10.1998 | ||
NL | 01.11.1998 | ||
ES | 16.07.2000 | ||
Former [2003/18] | CH | 30.04.1998 | |
IE | 30.04.1998 | ||
LI | 30.04.1998 | ||
LU | 30.04.1998 | ||
SE | 01.05.1998 | ||
MC | 31.10.1998 | ||
PT | 31.10.1998 | ||
NL | 01.11.1998 | ||
ES | 16.07.2000 | ||
Former [2003/17] | CH | 30.04.1998 | |
IE | 30.04.1998 | ||
LI | 30.04.1998 | ||
LU | 30.04.1998 | ||
SE | 01.05.1998 | ||
PT | 31.10.1998 | ||
NL | 01.11.1998 | ||
MC | 03.11.1998 | ||
ES | 16.07.2000 | ||
Former [2001/27] | CH | 30.04.1998 | |
IE | 30.04.1998 | ||
LI | 30.04.1998 | ||
LU | 30.04.1998 | ||
SE | 01.05.1998 | ||
MC | 31.10.1998 | ||
PT | 31.10.1998 | ||
NL | 01.11.1998 | ||
ES | 16.07.2000 | ||
Former [2001/01] | CH | 30.04.1998 | |
IE | 30.04.1998 | ||
LI | 30.04.1998 | ||
LU | 30.04.1998 | ||
SE | 01.05.1998 | ||
MC | 31.10.1998 | ||
PT | 31.10.1998 | ||
NL | 01.11.1998 | ||
Former [2000/07] | CH | 30.04.1998 | |
LI | 30.04.1998 | ||
LU | 30.04.1998 | ||
SE | 01.05.1998 | ||
MC | 31.10.1998 | ||
PT | 31.10.1998 | ||
NL | 01.11.1998 | ||
Former [1999/32] | CH | 30.04.1998 | |
LI | 30.04.1998 | ||
SE | 01.05.1998 | ||
MC | 31.10.1998 | ||
PT | 31.10.1998 | ||
NL | 01.11.1998 | ||
Former [1999/29] | CH | 30.04.1998 | |
LI | 30.04.1998 | ||
MC | 31.10.1998 | ||
PT | 31.10.1998 | ||
NL | 01.11.1998 | ||
Former [1999/26] | CH | 30.04.1998 | |
LI | 30.04.1998 | ||
MC | 31.10.1998 | ||
NL | 01.11.1998 | ||
Former [1999/22] | CH | 30.04.1998 | |
LI | 30.04.1998 | ||
NL | 01.11.1998 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3595181 (ANDERSON WILLIAM M, et al); | [A]US3881431 (DISABATINO SABATINO); | [A]DE2731549 (KELLEY CO INC); | [Y]US4800824 (DIFONZO MARK A [US]); | [Y]EP0338183 (HOWORKA FRANZ [AT]); | [A]US4987837 (RESCHLY DAVID C [US], et al) |