EP0571848 - Local paging receiver [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.01.1999 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): LU | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eta SA Fabriques d'Ebauches Schild-Rust-Strasse 17 2540 Granges / CH | [1998/11] |
Former [1994/08] | For all designated states Eta SA Fabriques d'Ebauches Schild-Rust-Strasse 17 CH-2540 Granges / CH | ||
Former [1993/48] | For all designated states Eta SA Fabriques d'Ebauches Schild-Rust-Strasse 17 CH-2540 Granges / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
De Luigi, Bruno Hefliecherstrasse 9 CH-5632 Buttwil / CH | 02 /
Maas, Ulrich Kirschenweg 11 CH-2575 Gerolfingen / CH | [1993/48] | Representative(s) | de Montmollin, Henri, et al ICB Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets SA Rue des Sors 7 2074 Marin / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1993/48] | de Montmollin, Henri, et al ICB Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets SA Rue des Sors 7 CH-2074 Marin / CH | Application number, filing date | 93107925.5 | 14.05.1993 | [1993/48] | Priority number, date | CH19920001717 | 27.05.1992 Original published format: CH 171792 | [1993/48] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0571848 | Date: | 01.12.1993 | Language: | FR | [1993/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0571848 | Date: | 11.03.1998 | Language: | FR | [1998/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.09.1993 | Classification | IPC: | G08B3/10, G08B5/22 | [1993/48] | CPC: |
G08B3/105 (EP,US);
G08B5/227 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LU, NL, SE [1993/48] | Title | German: | Lokale Funkempfänger | [1993/48] | English: | Local paging receiver | [1993/48] | French: | Récepteur d'appel local | [1993/48] | Examination procedure | 21.12.1993 | Examination requested [1994/08] | 30.04.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.09.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.12.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 22.12.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.12.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 11.03.1998 | ES | 11.03.1998 | GB | 11.03.1998 | GR | 11.03.1998 | IT | 11.03.1998 | NL | 11.03.1998 | LU | 14.05.1998 | BE | 31.05.1998 | DK | 11.06.1998 | SE | 11.06.1998 | DE | 13.06.1998 | IE | 24.09.1998 | [2004/38] |
Former [2003/45] | AT | 11.03.1998 | |
ES | 11.03.1998 | ||
GB | 11.03.1998 | ||
GR | 11.03.1998 | ||
IT | 11.03.1998 | ||
NL | 11.03.1998 | ||
BE | 31.05.1998 | ||
LU | 31.05.1998 | ||
DK | 11.06.1998 | ||
SE | 11.06.1998 | ||
DE | 13.06.1998 | ||
IE | 24.09.1998 | ||
Former [2003/07] | AT | 11.03.1998 | |
ES | 11.03.1998 | ||
GB | 11.03.1998 | ||
GR | 11.03.1998 | ||
IT | 11.03.1998 | ||
NL | 11.03.1998 | ||
BE | 31.05.1998 | ||
LU | 31.05.1998 | ||
SE | 11.06.1998 | ||
DE | 13.06.1998 | ||
IE | 24.09.1998 | ||
Former [2002/25] | AT | 11.03.1998 | |
ES | 11.03.1998 | ||
GB | 11.03.1998 | ||
GR | 11.03.1998 | ||
IT | 11.03.1998 | ||
BE | 31.05.1998 | ||
LU | 31.05.1998 | ||
SE | 11.06.1998 | ||
DE | 13.06.1998 | ||
IE | 24.09.1998 | ||
Former [2002/10] | AT | 11.03.1998 | |
GB | 11.03.1998 | ||
GR | 11.03.1998 | ||
IT | 11.03.1998 | ||
BE | 31.05.1998 | ||
LU | 31.05.1998 | ||
SE | 11.06.1998 | ||
DE | 13.06.1998 | ||
IE | 24.09.1998 | ||
Former [2000/05] | AT | 11.03.1998 | |
GB | 11.03.1998 | ||
GR | 11.03.1998 | ||
IE | 11.03.1998 | ||
IT | 11.03.1998 | ||
BE | 31.05.1998 | ||
LU | 31.05.1998 | ||
SE | 11.06.1998 | ||
DE | 13.06.1998 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 11.03.1998 | |
GB | 11.03.1998 | ||
IE | 11.03.1998 | ||
IT | 11.03.1998 | ||
BE | 31.05.1998 | ||
SE | 11.06.1998 | ||
DE | 13.06.1998 | ||
Former [1999/27] | AT | 11.03.1998 | |
GB | 11.03.1998 | ||
IE | 11.03.1998 | ||
BE | 31.05.1998 | ||
SE | 11.06.1998 | ||
DE | 13.06.1998 | ||
Former [1999/16] | AT | 11.03.1998 | |
GB | 11.03.1998 | ||
IE | 11.03.1998 | ||
SE | 11.06.1998 | ||
DE | 13.06.1998 | ||
Former [1999/02] | AT | 11.03.1998 | |
GB | 11.03.1998 | ||
SE | 11.06.1998 | ||
DE | 13.06.1998 | ||
Former [1999/01] | AT | 11.03.1998 | |
SE | 11.06.1998 | ||
DE | 13.06.1998 | ||
Former [1998/43] | AT | 11.03.1998 | |
SE | 11.06.1998 | ||
Former [1998/40] | AT | 11.03.1998 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0341905 (AMERICAN TELEPHONE & TELEGRAPH [US]); | [A]EP0413369 (ATE CORP [US]); | [A]WO9102434 (MOTOROLA INC [US]); | [A]EP0232123 |