EP0573044 - Structure of releasing part [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.05.1997 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.05.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.06.1997 [1997/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NITTO DENKO CORPORATION 1-2, Shimohozumi 1-chome Ibaraki-shi Osaka / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1993/49] | For all designated states NITTO DENKO CORPORATION 1-2, Shimohozumi 1-chome Ibaraki-shi Osaka / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Arakawa, Masaaki, c/o NITTO DENKO CORP. 1-2, Shimohozumi 1-chome Ibaraki-shi, Osaka / JP | [1993/49] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/49] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 93108954.4 | 03.06.1993 | [1993/49] | Priority number, date | JP19920171925 | 05.06.1992 Original published format: JP 17192592 | [1993/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0573044 | Date: | 08.12.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0573044 | Date: | 03.08.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.06.1994 | Classification | IPC: | A61F13/58, C09J7/02, A61F13/60 | [1994/29] | CPC: |
A61F13/60 (EP,US);
A61F13/15 (KR);
Y10T428/14 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1462 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1476 (EP,US);
Y10T428/28 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2839 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1993/49] | A61F13/58, C09J7/02 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1993/49] | Title | German: | Struktur von trennbarem Teil | [1993/49] | English: | Structure of releasing part | [1993/49] | French: | Structure de partie séparable | [1993/49] | Examination procedure | 04.10.1994 | Examination requested [1994/48] | 26.10.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.04.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.08.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.12.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1997/26] | 16.01.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1997/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DPX]EP0510200 (NITTO DENKO CORP [JP]) [DPX] 1-5 * & jp50-17728 * * the whole document *; | [X]US3797495 (SCHMIDT G) [X] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0478512 (VIBAC SPA [IT]) [X] 1-4 * page 2, line 17 - line 48 * * claims 1,4-6 *; | [PX]EP0519086 (NITTO DENKO CORP [JP]) [PX] 1-5 * column 3, line 30 - line 40 * * column 5, line 33 - column 6, line 35 * * claims 1-4,6 * * figure 1 *; | [A]EP0458581 (AVERY DENNISON CORP [US]) [A] 1 * page 1, line 1 - line 9 * * page 2, line 27 - line 41 * * claim 1 * * figure 1 * |