EP0575868 - Ball valve having replaceable seals under full service pressure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.05.1996 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.05.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.06.1996 [1996/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Chronister, Clyde Hubert 6115 Bermuda Dunes Houston Texas 77069 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/52] | For all designated states Chronister, Clyde Hubert 6115 Bermuda Dunes Houston, Texas 77069 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1993/52] | Representative(s) | Henkel & Partner mbB Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/52] | Henkel, Feiler, Hänzel & Partner Möhlstrasse 37 D-81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 93109555.8 | 15.06.1993 | [1993/52] | Priority number, date | US19920898367 | 15.06.1992 Original published format: US 898367 | [1993/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0575868 | Date: | 29.12.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.10.1993 | Classification | IPC: | F16K5/06, F16K5/20, F16K5/22 | [1993/52] | CPC: |
F16K5/0626 (EP,US);
F16K5/0663 (EP,US);
Y10T137/6038 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1993/52] | Title | German: | Kugelhahn mit unter Betriebsdruck austauschbaren Dichtungen | [1993/52] | English: | Ball valve having replaceable seals under full service pressure | [1993/52] | French: | Robinet à tournant sphérique avec des garnitures remplaçable sous pression de service | [1993/52] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 29.06.1994 | Examination requested [1994/35] | 02.01.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1996/26] | 01.02.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1996/26] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.1995 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US1597456 (MINARD EVERETT S); | [X]US2233074 (CORBIN JR ELBERT A); | [A]US3154094 (BREDTSCHNEIDER KURT B, et al); | [A]FR1561462 ; | [A]US3580268 (SHAFER HOMER J); | [A]DE2342069 ; | [A]EP0011289 (KUBOTA LTD [JP]); | [A]US4273152 (FREEMAN MURRAY E); | [AD]US4512360 (CHRONISTER CLYDE H [US]) |