EP0579008 - Oil burner [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.11.1996 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.11.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.12.1996 [1996/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KRAFT-INDUSTRIEWARMETECHNIK DR. RICKE GmbH Franziskusstrasse 18 D-63768 Hösbach / DE | [1994/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ricke, Hans-Benno, Dr. Franziskusstrasse 18 D-8759 Hösbach 2 / DE | [1994/03] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [1996/11] |
Former [1994/03] | Spalthoff, Adolf, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte, Dipl.-Ing. A. Spalthoff, Dipl.-Ing. K. Lelgemann, Postfach 34 02 20 D-45074 Essen / DE | Application number, filing date | 93110067.1 | 24.06.1993 | [1994/03] | Priority number, date | DE19924222839 | 11.07.1992 Original published format: DE 4222839 | [1994/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0579008 | Date: | 19.01.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0579008 | Date: | 23.02.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.12.1993 | Classification | IPC: | F23D11/10, F23D11/40 | [1994/03] | CPC: |
F23D11/408 (EP);
F23D11/007 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1994/03] | Title | German: | Ölbrenner | [1994/03] | English: | Oil burner | [1994/03] | French: | Brûleur à huile | [1994/03] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 29.07.1994 | Examination requested [1994/39] | 14.12.1995 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 09.01.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.01.1996 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 21.05.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1996/52] | 29.07.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1996/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.1995 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   14.12.1995 | 30.06.1996 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1565844 (COULON) [A] 1,10,11 * page 1, line 23 - page 1, line 43 * * page 2, line 27 - page 2, line 45 * * page 3, line 45 - page 3, line 94 * * page 3, line 128 - page 4, line 7 * * page 4, line 35 - page 5, line 57 * * figures 1-6 *; | [A]DE962391 (DAIMLER-BENZ AG) [A] 1,3,5,11 * page 1, line 1 - page 1, line 25 * * page 2, line 64 - page 3, line 40 * * figures 1,2 *; | [A]US2303104 (ABBEY) [A] 3,4 * page 1, column R, line 53 - page 2, column L, line 68; figures 1-4 *; | [A]FR1350802 (HERSAN ET CIE) [A] 4 * page 1, column R, paragraph 3 - page 1, column R, paragraph 4; figures 1,2 * |