EP0582873 - Shower enclosure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.08.1996 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.08.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.10.1996 [1996/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STIEMERT DUSCHGLAS KG Hakenbrinkweg 7 D-59846 Sundern/Sauerland / DE | [1994/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stiemert, Franz Ingenieur Hakenbrinkweg 7 D-59846 Sundern / DE | [1994/07] | Representative(s) | von Rohr, Hans Wilhelm Gesthuysen, von Rohr & Eggert Postfach 10 13 54 45013 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/07] | von Rohr, Hans Wilhelm, Dipl.-Phys. Patentanwälte Gesthuysen, von Rohr & Weidener, Postfach 10 13 54 D-45013 Essen / DE | Application number, filing date | 93111794.9 | 23.07.1993 | [1994/07] | Priority number, date | DE19924226305 | 08.08.1992 Original published format: DE 4226305 | DE19924236376 | 28.10.1992 Original published format: DE 4236376 | [1994/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0582873 | Date: | 16.02.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.11.1993 | Classification | IPC: | E06B3/88 | [1994/07] | CPC: |
E06B7/362 (EP);
E06B2007/365 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1994/07] | Title | German: | Duschabtrennung | [1994/07] | English: | Shower enclosure | [1994/07] | French: | Paroi de douche | [1994/07] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 28.02.1994 | Examination requested [1994/17] | 04.10.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.03.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.09.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 22.11.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 11.12.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.03.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1996/40] | 26.04.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1996/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3705800 (HÜPPE GMBH) [A] 1,8,9 * figure 2 *; | [A]US4953261 (LYONS) [A] 1,19,20,22-24,27,30,32 * figure 6 * |