|
10.11.2009 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.09.2006 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.08.2006 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
10 |
|
19.07.2006 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.07.2006 |
F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.05.2006 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
08.05.2006 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.03.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.03.2006 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.02.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.02.2006 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
4 |
|
16.02.2006 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.02.2006 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
6 |
|
13.02.2006 |
Change of composition of the board (except boards 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.01.2006 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.12.2005 |
Request for change of representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.11.2004 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.02.2003 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.02.2003 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
07.02.2003 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
19.12.2002 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.12.2002 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.11.2002 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.11.2002 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.11.2002 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.11.2002 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.10.2002 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.09.2002 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
27.08.2002 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.08.2002 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.08.2002 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.05.2002 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
6 |
|
12.04.2002 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.04.2002 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.04.2002 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
24 |
|
03.04.2002 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.04.2002 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
10 |
|
08.02.2002 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.02.2002 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.02.2002 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
4 |
|
04.02.2002 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.01.2002 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.01.2002 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.01.2002 |
Communication about missing advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.01.2002 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.12.2001 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.12.2001 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.12.2001 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
8 |
|
06.12.2001 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
14 |
|
06.12.2001 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
6 |
|
06.12.2001 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
3 |
|
06.12.2001 |
Documents for the maintenance of the patent as amended |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.12.2001 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
10 |
|
06.12.2001 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.11.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.11.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.11.2001 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
9 |
|
16.11.2001 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.11.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
31.10.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.10.2001 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
4 |
|
24.10.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.10.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.10.2001 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
15.10.2001 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.10.2001 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.10.2001 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.10.2001 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
6 |
|
17.08.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.06.2001 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.03.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.03.2001 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.03.2001 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.03.2001 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.03.2001 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.03.2001 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.03.2001 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.03.2001 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
07.03.2001 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.02.2001 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.10.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.09.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.09.2000 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.09.2000 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
5 |
|
07.09.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.08.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.08.2000 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.05.2000 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.05.2000 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
04.05.2000 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.11.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.11.1999 |
Communication of amended entries |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.11.1999 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.11.1999 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.11.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.10.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.10.1999 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.10.1999 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.10.1999 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.06.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.06.1999 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
4 |
|
30.12.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.12.1998 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
9 |
|
12.10.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.10.1998 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.10.1998 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.06.1998 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.06.1998 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.06.1998 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.05.1998 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
18.05.1998 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
18.05.1998 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
18.05.1998 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
7 |
|
18.05.1998 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
18.05.1998 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
15 |
|
18.05.1998 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
38 |
|
18.05.1998 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
18.05.1998 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
18.05.1998 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
18.05.1998 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
18.05.1998 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
18.05.1998 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
18.05.1998 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
27 |
|
10.07.1997 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.05.1997 |
Approval of request for amendments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.05.1997 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.05.1997 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.05.1997 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
09.05.1997 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.03.1997 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.03.1997 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.03.1997 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.02.1997 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
12.02.1997 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.10.1996 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.10.1996 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
21 |
|
09.10.1996 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.03.1995 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.02.1995 |
Request for assignment |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.02.1995 |
Request for assignment |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
15.02.1995 |
Request for assignment |
Search / examination |
27 |
|
15.02.1995 |
Request for assignment |
Search / examination |
50 |
|
10.08.1994 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.07.1994 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.07.1994 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.11.1993 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.11.1993 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.08.1993 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.08.1993 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
31 |
|
28.08.1993 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
25 |
|
26.07.1993 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.07.1993 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
26.07.1993 |
Description |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
26.07.1993 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.07.1993 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.07.1993 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.07.1993 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
26.07.1993 |
Specification filed by fax and/or in non-official language |
Search / examination |
18 |