EP0586858 - Subcostal patch electrode [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.01.1998 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.01.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.03.1998 [1998/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pacesetter AB Röntgenvägen 2 171 95 Solna / SE | [1997/13] |
Former [1995/08] | For all designated states Pacesetter AB Röntgenvägen 2 S-171 95 Solna / SE | ||
Former [1994/11] | For:SE
Siemens Elema AB Röntgenvägen 2 S-171 95 Solna 1 / SE | ||
For:DE
FR
GB
IT
NL
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Neubauer, Heinz Lädersättravägen 39 S-175 70 Järfälla / SE | 02 /
Bowald, Staffan Hagby Gard S-740 10 Almunge / SE | 03 /
Hirschberg, Jakub Aprilvägen 3 S-183 44 Täby / SE | [1994/11] | Representative(s) | Lettström, Richard Wilhelm Albihns Stockholm AB, Box 5581 114 85 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/08] | Lettström, Richard Wilhelm H. Albihns Patentbyra AB, Box 3137 S-103 62 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 93112068.7 | 28.07.1993 | [1994/11] | Priority number, date | US19920940542 | 04.09.1992 Original published format: US 940542 | [1994/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0586858 | Date: | 16.03.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0586858 | Date: | 26.03.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.01.1993 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/05 | [1994/11] | CPC: |
A61N1/05 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1994/11] | Title | German: | Flexible, flächige Kissenelektrode zur Einpflanzung unter einer Rippe | [1994/11] | English: | Subcostal patch electrode | [1994/11] | French: | Electrode plane et flexible pour l'implantation sous une côte | [1994/11] | Examination procedure | 07.04.1994 | Examination requested [1994/22] | 17.05.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.09.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.12.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 19.12.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.12.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 26.06.1997 | [1998/11] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4026302 (GRAYZEL JOSEPH) [A] 1-17 * column W *; | [A]EP0460324 (CARDIAC PACEMAKERS INC [US]) [A] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2178143 (KRAUS WERNER [DE]) [A] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [DA]US4662377 (HEILMAN MARLIN S [US], et al) [DA] 1-17 * column W * |