|
14.02.2005 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.02.2005 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
17 |
|
04.01.2005 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
4 |
|
26.11.2004 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.11.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
13 |
|
22.11.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
15 |
|
22.11.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
17.09.2004 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.09.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.07.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.07.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.07.2004 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.07.2004 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
9 |
|
24.07.2004 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.06.2004 |
Communication: Transfer of procedural status |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.06.2004 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.05.2004 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
08.03.2004 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.10.2003 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.10.2003 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
25.08.2003 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.08.2003 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.04.2003 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.04.2003 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.03.2003 |
Annex |
Appeal |
9 |
|
28.03.2003 |
Annex |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.03.2003 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
27.02.2003 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.02.2003 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.02.2003 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.02.2003 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.01.2003 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.12.2002 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.12.2002 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.11.2002 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.11.2002 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.11.2002 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
3 |
|
27.11.2002 |
Decision rejecting the opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
27.11.2002 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
5 |
|
27.11.2002 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.10.2002 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.10.2002 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.10.2002 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.07.2002 |
Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.07.2002 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.06.2002 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.06.2002 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.06.2002 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.06.2002 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.05.2002 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.05.2002 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.05.2002 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.05.2002 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.05.2002 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.12.2000 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.11.2000 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
9 |
|
09.03.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.01.1999 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
11 |
|
21.01.1999 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
11 |
|
16.11.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.11.1998 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.11.1998 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.10.1998 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.08.1998 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.07.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.07.1998 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.07.1998 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.07.1998 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.07.1998 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.07.1998 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.06.1998 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.06.1998 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
10 |
|
10.06.1998 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
9 |
|
10.06.1998 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
10.06.1998 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
10.06.1998 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
10.06.1998 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
10.06.1998 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
10.06.1998 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
18 |
|
31.07.1997 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.06.1997 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.06.1997 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.06.1997 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.06.1997 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
13.03.1997 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.03.1997 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.03.1997 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.10.1996 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
29.10.1996 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
16.10.1996 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.09.1996 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.09.1996 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.09.1996 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.09.1996 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
26.07.1996 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.07.1996 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.07.1996 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.03.1996 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.12.1994 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.12.1994 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.11.1994 |
Request for assignment |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
28.07.1994 |
Refund order of filing/examination fee |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.03.1994 |
Refund order search fee |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.02.1994 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.02.1994 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.10.1993 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.10.1993 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.10.1993 |
Description |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
19.10.1993 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.10.1993 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
19.10.1993 |
Letter concerning search matters |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
19.10.1993 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
19.10.1993 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |