EP0603502 - Machine for manufacturing book covers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.07.1997 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.09.1997 [1997/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kolbus GmbH & Co. KG Osnabrücker Strasse 77 32369 Rahden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/26] | For all designated states Kolbus GmbH & Co. KG Osnabrücker Strasse 77 D-32369 Rahden / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rathert, Horst Stiftsallee 120 D-32425 Minden / DE | [1994/26] | Application number, filing date | 93117532.7 | 29.10.1993 | [1994/26] | Priority number, date | DE19934308470 | 17.03.1993 Original published format: DE 4308470 | DE19924241387 | 09.12.1992 Original published format: DE 4241387 | [1994/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0603502 | Date: | 29.06.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0603502 | Date: | 18.09.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.04.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B42C7/00, B32B31/00 | [1994/26] | CPC: |
B32B38/1825 (EP,US);
B42C7/00 (EP,US);
Y10T156/1744 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1994/26] | Title | German: | Buchdeckenmaschine | [1994/26] | English: | Machine for manufacturing book covers | [1994/26] | French: | Machine à fabriquer des couvertures de livres | [1994/26] | Examination procedure | 19.07.1994 | Examination requested [1994/37] | 19.01.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.02.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.02.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 13.02.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.06.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US1794521 (ARNOLD KIRCHHOFER); | [A]DE643760 (JULIUS TRUEMPER) [A] 6 * figure 2 *; | [A]US3964953 (MITCHARD JOHN M, et al); | [A]DE3338862 (AULFES BAYERWALD PLASTIK [DE]) [A] 6 * figure 2 *; | [YA]EP0392974 (GURIT ESSEX AG [CH]) [Y] 1,7 * figure 6 * * column 3, line 34 - line 47 * * column 4, line 34 - line 37 * * column 5, line 8 - line 51 * [A] 5 | [Y] - E. BENDIG ET AL., Lehrbuch der industriellen Buchbinderei, ITZEHOE, DE, VERLAG BERUF + SCHULE, (1990) [Y] 1,7 * Kapitel 8.4.2 'Maschinelle Fertigung von Buchdecken' * * figure 8.33 * * page 321, line 14 - line 35 * | [A] - G.M.W. WORTEL ET AL., Brocheren en uitgaafbinden', AMSTERDAM / HOUTEN, GOC-UITGEVERIJ / GAADE UITGEVERS, (1991) [A] 1 * Bind- en afwerkingstechniek Vol.2 * * Kapitel 8 'Boekbandvervaardinging' * * figure 8.6 * |