EP0596506 - Duty cycle controller for anti-lock braking-pressure regulating valve, using wheel speed deviation from target value and/or time derivative thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.12.1997 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.01.1998 [1998/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1 Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1994/19] | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Aizawa, Hideyuki, c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA K.K. 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | 02 /
Nakamura, Akira, c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA K.K. 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | 03 /
Monzaki, Shiro, c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA K.K. 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | 04 /
Yoneyama, Masatoshi, c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA K.K. 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | [1994/19] | Representative(s) | Tiedtke, Harro, et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/19] | Tiedtke, Harro, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 D-80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 93117926.1 | 04.11.1993 | [1994/19] | Priority number, date | JP19920321288 | 05.11.1992 Original published format: JP 32128892 | [1994/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0596506 | Date: | 11.05.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0596506 | Date: | 29.01.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.02.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B60T8/32 | [1994/19] | CPC: |
B60T8/172 (EP,US);
B60T8/17616 (EP,US);
B60T8/4275 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1994/19] | Title | German: | Antiblockierarbeitszyklus-Steuerungsgerät für Druckventile, wobei der Unterschied zwischen Rad und Zielgeschwindigkeit benutzt wird und/oder die Zeitableitung davon | [1994/19] | English: | Duty cycle controller for anti-lock braking-pressure regulating valve, using wheel speed deviation from target value and/or time derivative thereof | [1994/19] | French: | Régulateur du cycle de travail d'une valve de régulation de pression d'un anti-blocage, utilisant la déviation de la vitesse de roue par rapport à une valeur de référence et/ou une dérivée par rapport au temps de celle-ci | [1994/19] | Examination procedure | 04.11.1993 | Examination requested [1994/19] | 01.03.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.07.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.09.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.01.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.07.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.10.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 23.10.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.10.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE4030593 (AISIN SEIKI [JP]) [A] 1,8,11 * abstract * * column 2, line 6 - column 3, line 56 * * column 7, line 5 - column 9, line 26 * * column 11, line 64 - column 16, line 62 *; | [A]DE4021993 (NIPPON DENSO CO [JP]) [A] 1,11 * the whole document *; | [A]DE3729963 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]) [A] 1,8,11,13 * the whole document *; | [A]DE3825639 (SEPP GUNTHER [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract * * column 2, line 36 - column 3, line 22 *; | [APD]EP0534418 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [APD] 1,8 * abstract * * page 2, line 52 - page 4, line 11 * * page 5, line 43 - page 7, line 53 * * page 12, line 46 - page 13, line 8 * |