EP0643383 - Magnetic head adjustment system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.02.1999 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TANDBERG DATA ASA Kjelsasveien 161 P.O. Box 134, Kjelsas 0411 Oslo / NO | [1998/15] |
Former [1998/14] | For all designated states TANDBERG DATA A/S Kjelsasveien 161 Postboks 9 Korsvoll 0808 Oslo 8 / NO | ||
Former [1995/11] | For all designated states TANDBERG DATA A/S Kjelsasveien 161 Postboks 9 Korsvoll N-0808 Oslo 8 / NO | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Guttorm, Rudi Edvard Griegsvei 17 N-1472 Fjellhamer / NO | 02 /
Nils, Martin Teien Teglhagvn. 20 N-3125 Tonsberg / NO | [1995/21] |
Former [1995/11] | 01 /
Guttorm, Rudi Edvard Griegsvei 17 NO-1472 Fjellhamer / NO | ||
02 /
Nils, Martin Teien Teglhagvn. 20 NO-3125 Tonsberg / NO | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J., et al Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/11] | Goddar, Heinz J., Dr., et al FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 D-80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 93118138.2 | 09.11.1993 | [1995/11] | Priority number, date | US19930122197 | 15.09.1993 Original published format: US 122197 | [1995/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0643383 | Date: | 15.03.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0643383 | Date: | 02.08.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0643383 | Date: | 01.04.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.06.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G11B5/55, G11B21/08 | [1995/27] | CPC: |
G11B5/56 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1995/11] | G11B5/55 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1995/11] | Title | German: | Magnetkopf-Justierungsvorrichtung | [1995/11] | English: | Magnetic head adjustment system | [1995/11] | French: | Système d'ajustement de tête magnétique | [1995/11] | Examination procedure | 16.01.1996 | Examination requested [1996/12] | 06.11.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.03.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.06.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.09.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.12.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 18.12.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.01.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 01.04.1998 | GB | 09.11.1998 | [2006/14] |
Former [2000/03] | FR | 28.08.1998 | |
GB | 09.11.1998 | ||
Former [1998/52] | FR | 28.08.1998 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3112895 (TANDBERG DATA A/S) [A] 1,5 * page 6, line 7 - line 19; figures 1,2 *; | [AD]US4609959 (GUTTORM RUDI) [AD] 1,5 * column 4, line 21 - line 42; figures 1,2 *; | [AD]US5105322 (EDWARD L. STELTZER) [AD] 1,5 * column 6, line 11 - line 22; figures 3,8 * |