|
01.12.2009 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.02.2004 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.12.2003 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
20 |
|
11.12.2003 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
20 |
|
18.11.2003 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.11.2003 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
17.11.2003 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.11.2003 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
17.09.2003 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.09.2003 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.09.2003 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.09.2003 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.09.2003 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.08.2003 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.08.2003 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
13 |
|
05.08.2003 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
05.08.2003 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
05.08.2003 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
05.08.2003 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.07.2003 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.06.2003 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.05.2003 |
F3326 Communication with time limit (inter partes) |
Appeal |
5 |
|
17.04.2003 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.12.2002 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.12.2002 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.12.2002 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
11.12.2002 |
Non-scannable object |
Appeal |
4 |
|
19.08.2002 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.08.2002 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
10.08.2002 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.08.2002 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
4 |
|
11.07.2002 |
Communication: Transfer of procedural status |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.07.2002 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.06.2002 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.06.2002 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.06.2002 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.06.2002 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.06.2002 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
06.06.2002 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
3 |
|
18.04.2002 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.04.2002 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.04.2002 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.04.2002 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.04.2002 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.04.2002 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.04.2002 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.04.2002 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
3 |
|
12.04.2002 |
Decision rejecting the opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
12.04.2002 |
Documents for the maintenance of the patent as amended |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.04.2002 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
7 |
|
12.04.2002 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.02.2002 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.02.2002 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.02.2002 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.02.2002 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
08.02.2002 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
27.11.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.11.2001 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.11.2001 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.11.2001 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.11.2001 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.11.2001 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.10.2001 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.10.2001 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
30.10.2001 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.10.2001 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.11.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.11.2000 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.11.2000 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.09.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.09.2000 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.09.2000 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.09.2000 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.05.2000 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.05.2000 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
17.04.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.04.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.04.2000 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.04.2000 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.04.2000 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.04.2000 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.04.2000 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.04.2000 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.04.2000 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.04.2000 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
5 |
|
31.03.2000 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
8 |
|
02.03.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.02.2000 |
Request for assignment |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.02.2000 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.02.2000 |
Request for assignment |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.02.2000 |
Request for assignment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.02.2000 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.02.2000 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.11.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.11.1999 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.11.1999 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
02.11.1999 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.11.1999 |
Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor |
Opposition |
8 |
|
20.07.1999 |
Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.07.1999 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.07.1999 |
Description |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.07.1999 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
08.07.1999 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
11.05.1999 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.05.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.05.1999 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.05.1999 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.12.1998 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.12.1998 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.12.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.11.1998 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.11.1998 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.11.1998 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.11.1998 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
24.11.1998 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
24.11.1998 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
24.11.1998 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
24.11.1998 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
22.11.1998 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.11.1998 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.11.1998 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
22.11.1998 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
15.01.1998 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.09.1997 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.09.1997 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.09.1997 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.09.1997 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.09.1997 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.06.1997 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.05.1997 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.05.1997 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of third party observations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.05.1997 |
Transmittal of third party observations to applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.04.1997 |
Observations by third parties |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.02.1997 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
11.02.1997 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
24.01.1997 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.11.1994 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.11.1994 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.12.1993 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.12.1993 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
20.11.1993 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.11.1993 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.11.1993 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.11.1993 |
Description |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
20.11.1993 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.11.1993 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |