EP0602421 - Low power, high performance programmable logic arrays [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.05.1998 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/06] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | ||
Former [1994/25] | For all designated states INTERNATIONAL BUSINESS MACHINES CORPORATION Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ditlow, Gary Stephen 53 Moog Road Garrison, NY 10524 / US | 02 /
Oakland, Steven Frederick 7 Norway Drive Colchester, VT 05446 / US | 03 /
Pham, Dac Cong 17855 Park Valley Drive Round Rock, TX 78681 / US | 04 /
Shaw, Kenneth James 33 Aspen Drive Essex Junction, VT 05452 / US | [1994/25] | Representative(s) | Schäfer, Wolfgang, et al IBM Deutschland Informationssysteme GmbH Patentwesen und Urheberrecht 70548 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/27] | Schäfer, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Ing., et al IBM Deutschland Informationssysteme GmbH Patentwesen und Urheberrecht 70548 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [1994/25] | Harrison, Robert John IBM Deutschland Informationssysteme GmbH, Patentwesen und Urheberrecht D-70548 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 93118892.4 | 24.11.1993 | [1994/25] | Priority number, date | US19920992216 | 17.12.1992 Original published format: US 992216 | [1994/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0602421 | Date: | 22.06.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0602421 | Date: | 29.03.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0602421 | Date: | 02.07.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.02.1995 | Classification | IPC: | H03K19/177, H03K19/00 | [1995/13] | CPC: |
H03K19/0016 (EP,US);
H03K19/1772 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1994/25] | H03K19/177 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1994/25] | Title | German: | Programmierbare logische Felder hoher Leistung mit geringem Verbrauch | [1997/27] | English: | Low power, high performance programmable logic arrays | [1994/25] | French: | Réseaux logiques programmables à haute performance et à faible consommation | [1994/25] |
Former [1994/25] | Programmierbare logische Felder hoher Leistung mit geringem Verbrand | Examination procedure | 21.10.1994 | Examination requested [1994/50] | 05.08.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.11.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.12.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 23.12.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.04.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 02.07.1997 | DE | 03.10.1997 | GB | 24.11.1997 | [2006/14] |
Former [1998/41] | DE | 03.10.1997 | |
GB | 24.11.1997 | ||
FR | 28.11.1997 | ||
Former [1998/19] | DE | 03.10.1997 | |
FR | 28.11.1997 | ||
Former [1998/15] | DE | 03.10.1997 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS58170123 ; | [A]EP0337676 (FUJITSU LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1 * abstract *; | US5033017 [ ] (TANIAI TAKAYOSHI [JP], et al); | [A]US4963769 (HILTPOLD W RANDOLPH [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 2, line 20 - line 34 *; | [A]EP0465002 (SGS THOMSON MICROELECTRONICS [US]) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19840110), vol. 8, no. 4, Database accession no. (E - 220), & JP58170123 A 00000000 (FUJITSU) [A] 1 * abstract * |