EP0604787 - Low bend loss singlemode optical waveguide fiber [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.03.2002 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.05.2002 [2002/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Corning Incorporated Houghton Park Corning NY 14831 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1994/27] | For all designated states Corning Incorporated Houghton Park Corning New York 14831 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Antos, Anthony Joseph Corning Inc., Patent Department, SP FR 02-12 Corning, NY 14831 / US | 02 /
Smith, David Kinney Corning Inc., Patent Department, SP FR 02-12 Corning, NY 14831 / US | [1994/27] | Representative(s) | Boon, Graham Anthony, et al Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/27] | Boon, Graham Anthony, et al Elkington and Fife Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 93119592.9 | 06.12.1993 | [1994/27] | Priority number, date | US19920999737 | 31.12.1992 Original published format: US 999737 | [1994/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0604787 | Date: | 06.07.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0604787 | Date: | 09.05.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.05.1994 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/22, G02B6/16 | [1994/27] | CPC: |
G02B6/03644 (EP,US);
C03C13/04 (EP,US);
G02B6/02214 (EP,US);
G02B6/03611 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1994/27] | Title | German: | Optische Monomode-Wellenleiterfaser mit niedrigen Krümmungsverlusten | [1999/30] | English: | Low bend loss singlemode optical waveguide fiber | [1994/27] | French: | Fibre optique monomode à faibles pertes par courbures | [1994/27] |
Former [1994/27] | Monomoden optische Wellenleiterfaser mit niedrigen Krümmungsverlusten | Examination procedure | 21.09.1994 | Examination requested [1994/47] | 12.11.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.05.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.09.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.02.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.06.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.12.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.06.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 31.10.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.01.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 03.01.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.02.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]EP0520337 (FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-3 * page 2, line 14 - line 28 * * page 3, line 20 - line 39 * * figures 1,2 * [A] 5; | [YDA]JPS5397849 ; | [A]WO8604689 (AMERICAN TELEPHONE & TELEGRAPH [US]) [A] 1,5,6 * page 7, line 10 - line 14 * * page 8, line 11 - line 16 * * figure 2 * | [YDA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19781028), vol. 2, no. 130, Database accession no. (E - 068), & JP53097849 A 00000000 (NTT) [YD] 1-3 * abstract * [A] 5 | [AD] - J.C. LAPP ET AL., "Segmented-Core Single-Mode Fiber Optimized for Bending Performance", JOURNAL OF LIGHTWAVE TECHNOLOGY., NEW YORK US, (198810), vol. 6, no. 10, doi:doi:10.1109/50.7901, pages 1462 - 1465, XP000028835 [AD] 1,5 * the whole article * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/50.7901 |