|
12.07.2005 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.07.2005 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
18 |
|
15.06.2005 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
7 |
|
12.05.2005 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.05.2005 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
09.05.2005 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
09.05.2005 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
09.05.2005 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
12.03.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.03.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.03.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.03.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.03.2005 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
7 |
|
01.03.2005 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.01.2004 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.01.2004 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
14.10.2002 |
Composition of the board (only boards 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.12.2000 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.10.2000 |
F3057 Communication: Change of responsibility of a Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.10.2000 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.10.2000 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.05.2000 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.05.2000 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
18.05.2000 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
14 |
|
17.05.2000 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.05.2000 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.05.2000 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
13.01.2000 |
F3056 Communication: Change of Board due to the technical nature of the appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.01.2000 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.01.2000 |
F3313 Order: change of Board due to the technical aspects of the appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.12.1999 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
8 |
|
12.10.1999 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.10.1999 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.10.1999 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.09.1999 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.08.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.08.1999 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.08.1999 |
Request for assignment |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.08.1999 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.08.1999 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.08.1999 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.08.1999 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.08.1999 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.08.1999 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.08.1999 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
3 |
|
03.08.1999 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.08.1999 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.08.1999 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
4 |
|
03.08.1999 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.08.1999 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.06.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.06.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.06.1999 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
11.06.1999 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
09.06.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.05.1999 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
29.05.1999 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
29.05.1999 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.03.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.02.1999 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.02.1999 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.02.1999 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.02.1999 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.02.1999 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.02.1999 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
23.02.1999 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.02.1999 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.02.1999 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.02.1999 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.02.1999 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.02.1999 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.10.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.10.1998 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.07.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.06.1998 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
26.05.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.05.1998 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.03.1998 |
Confirmation of revocation of automatic debit order |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.03.1998 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.03.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.03.1998 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.02.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.02.1998 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.02.1998 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.02.1998 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.01.1998 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.01.1998 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.01.1998 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.01.1998 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
9 |
|
20.01.1998 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Appeal |
17 |
|
20.01.1998 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
20.01.1998 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
20.01.1998 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
20.01.1998 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
15 |
|
20.01.1998 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
20.01.1998 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
20.01.1998 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
20.01.1998 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Appeal |
16 |
|
20.01.1998 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
20.01.1998 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
17 |
|
20.01.1998 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
18 |
|
04.01.1998 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
9 |
|
27.02.1997 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.12.1996 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.12.1996 |
Letter concerning the designation and/or extension and/or validation of states |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.12.1996 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.12.1996 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.10.1996 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
17.09.1996 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.06.1996 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.06.1996 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
12.06.1996 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.11.1994 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.11.1994 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.11.1994 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
11.08.1994 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
04.05.1994 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.05.1994 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
07.12.1993 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.12.1993 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.12.1993 |
Description |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
07.12.1993 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.12.1993 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.12.1993 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
07.12.1993 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |