|
16.06.2004 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.07.2003 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.02.2003 |
Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.08.2002 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.08.2002 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.08.2002 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.06.2002 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.06.2002 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.04.2002 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.04.2002 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.04.2002 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
36 |
|
18.02.2002 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.11.2001 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.11.2001 |
Description |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
27.11.2001 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.09.2001 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.05.2001 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.03.2001 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.03.2001 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.03.2001 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.03.2001 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
22 |
|
06.03.2001 |
F3314 Oral proceedings: Minutes (ex parte) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.02.2001 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.02.2001 |
F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.02.2001 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.02.2001 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
21.11.2000 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.11.2000 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.11.2000 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
5 |
|
15.11.2000 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.09.1998 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.09.1998 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (ex parte) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.07.1998 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
6 |
|
12.05.1998 |
Document concerning appeal fee |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.05.1998 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.04.1998 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.03.1998 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.03.1998 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.03.1998 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
04.03.1998 |
Request for assignment |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.03.1998 |
Request for assignment |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
02.03.1998 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.10.1997 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.10.1997 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.10.1997 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.09.1997 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.05.1997 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
13.01.1995 |
Maintenance of the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.07.1994 |
Maintenance of the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.05.1994 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
30.05.1994 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
22 |
|
30.05.1994 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
30.05.1994 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
28 |
|
30.05.1994 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
19 |
|
30.05.1994 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
18 |
|
30.05.1994 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.05.1994 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
28 |
|
30.05.1994 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
24 |
|
30.05.1994 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
30.05.1994 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
30.05.1994 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.05.1994 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.03.1994 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
18.03.1994 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.12.1993 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.12.1993 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
29.12.1993 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
29.12.1993 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
29.12.1993 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
29.12.1993 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
34 |
|
29.12.1993 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
29.12.1993 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
23.12.1993 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.12.1993 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.12.1993 |
Description |
Search / examination |
32 |
|
23.12.1993 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.12.1993 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
6 |