|
11.03.2014 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.11.2005 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.10.2005 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
2 |
|
30.09.2005 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
4 |
|
20.09.2005 |
Title page: Decision (inter partes / rejection of opposition) |
Appeal |
9 |
|
21.04.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.04.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.04.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.04.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.04.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.04.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.04.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.04.2005 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.04.2005 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.04.2005 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.03.2005 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.03.2005 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.03.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.03.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.03.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.03.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.03.2005 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
4 |
|
07.03.2005 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.03.2005 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.03.2005 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.02.2005 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.05.2004 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.05.2004 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.04.2004 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.04.2004 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.03.2004 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.02.2004 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.02.2004 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.12.2003 |
Submission concerning representation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.12.2003 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.12.2003 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.11.2003 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.08.2003 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.08.2003 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
7 |
|
03.07.2003 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.07.2003 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.07.2003 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.06.2003 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.06.2003 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.06.2003 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.05.2003 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.04.2003 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.04.2003 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.04.2003 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.04.2003 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.04.2003 |
Decision rejecting the opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
10.04.2003 |
Documents for the maintenance of the patent as amended |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.04.2003 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
6 |
|
10.04.2003 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.02.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.02.2003 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
17.02.2003 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
14.02.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.02.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
4 |
|
06.02.2003 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.02.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.02.2003 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.01.2003 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.01.2003 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.10.2002 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.10.2002 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.10.2002 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.10.2002 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.10.2002 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.10.2002 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.10.2002 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.08.2002 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
14 |
|
08.07.2002 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.07.2002 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.06.2002 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.06.2002 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.06.2002 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.06.2002 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
40 |
|
04.06.2002 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
01.02.2002 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.01.2002 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.01.2002 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
14.09.2001 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.09.2001 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.09.2001 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.06.2001 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.06.2001 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.06.2001 |
Document concerning appeal fee |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.05.2001 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.05.2001 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.05.2001 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.05.2001 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.05.2001 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.05.2001 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.05.2001 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.04.2001 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
4 |
|
27.04.2001 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
3 |
|
27.04.2001 |
Documents for the maintenance of the patent as amended |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.04.2001 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
5 |
|
27.04.2001 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.03.2001 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.12.2000 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.08.2000 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.08.2000 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.08.2000 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
17.08.2000 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.08.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.08.2000 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.07.2000 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.07.2000 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
21.02.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.02.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.02.2000 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.12.1999 |
Request for assignment |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.12.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.11.1999 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
9 |
|
26.11.1999 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
9 |
|
16.07.1999 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.07.1999 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
19.10.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.10.1998 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
9 |
|
02.10.1998 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.10.1998 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
9 |
|
09.09.1998 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.06.1998 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.06.1998 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.05.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.05.1998 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.05.1998 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
46 |
|
07.05.1998 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
07.05.1998 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
07.05.1998 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
07.05.1998 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
19 |
|
07.05.1998 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
07.05.1998 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
22 |
|
07.05.1998 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
18 |
|
07.05.1998 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
22 |
|
07.05.1998 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
07.05.1998 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
17 |
|
07.05.1998 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
21 |
|
05.05.1998 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.05.1998 |
Request for documents |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.04.1998 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
23.04.1998 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
9 |
|
12.06.1997 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.04.1997 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.04.1997 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
03.04.1997 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
20.01.1997 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.01.1997 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.11.1996 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.11.1996 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
13.11.1996 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.02.1996 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
26.02.1996 |
Description |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
26.02.1996 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
26.02.1996 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.11.1995 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
06.05.1993 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.05.1993 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.01.1993 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.01.1993 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
15.01.1993 |
Description |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
15.01.1993 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.01.1993 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
15.01.1993 |
Letter concerning search matters |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.01.1993 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
31 |
|
15.01.1993 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
15.01.1993 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
25 |