EP0555058 - (Oxo)sulfonium complex, polymerizable composition containing the complex, and method of polymerizing composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.03.1998 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.04.1998 [1998/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOYO INK MANUFACTURING CO., LTD. No. 3-13, Kyobashi 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1993/32] | For all designated states TOYO INK MANUFACTURING CO., LTD. No. 3-13, Kyobashi 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Toba, Yasumasa, c/o Toyo Ink Manuf. Co., Ltd. 3-13, Kyobashi 2-chome Chuo-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Yasuike, Madoka, c/o Toyo Ink Manuf. Co., Ltd. 3-13, Kyobashi 2-chome Chuo-ku, Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Yamaguchi, Takeo, c/o Toyo Ink Manuf. Co., Ltd. 3-13, Kyobashi 2-chome Chuo-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1993/32] | Representative(s) | Woods, Geoffrey Corlett, et al J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/44] | Woods, Geoffrey Corlett, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | ||
Former [1995/31] | Cresswell, Thomas Anthony J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | ||
Former [1993/32] | Myerscough, Philip Boyd J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 93300765.0 | 03.02.1993 | [1993/32] | Priority number, date | JP19920056831 | 07.02.1992 Original published format: JP 5683192 | JP19920090185 | 16.03.1992 Original published format: JP 9018592 | [1993/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0555058 | Date: | 11.08.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0555058 | Date: | 07.05.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.05.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C07F5/02, C08F2/50 | [1993/32] | CPC: |
C07F5/027 (EP);
C08F2/50 (EP);
G03F7/029 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1993/32] | Title | German: | (Oxo)Sulfoniumkomplex, diese enthaltende polymerisierbare Zusammensetzung und Verfahren zur Polymerisation | [1993/32] | English: | (Oxo)sulfonium complex, polymerizable composition containing the complex, and method of polymerizing composition | [1993/32] | French: | Complexe d'(oxo)sulfonium, composition polymérisable le contenant et méthode de polymérisation | [1993/32] | Examination procedure | 16.08.1993 | Examination requested [1993/41] | 03.08.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.02.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.05.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 03.09.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 12.09.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.12.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 09.12.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.02.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]JP02157760 ; | [A]DE1815868 | [XD] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 114, 1991, Columbus, Ohio, US; abstract no. 218098g, IMAHASHI, S. ET AL. page 751; & JP-A-02 157 760 (TOYOBO CO. LTD.), & JP02157760 A 00000000 | [A] - JOURNAL OF POLYMER SCIENCE: POLYMER LETTERS EDITION vol. 17, 1979, pages 759 - 764 CRIVELLO, J.V. ET AL. |