EP0558318 - Apparatus for radio frequency bipolar electrosurgery [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.06.1996 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.07.1996 [1996/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states G2 DESIGN LIMITED Charterhouse, Links Business Park St Mellons Cardiff, CF3 OLT, Wales / GB | [1993/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Goble, Nigel Mark 6 Tynewydd Drive Castleton, Nr. Cardiff / GB | 02 /
Goble, Colin Charles Owen 4 Bakers Court, Clive Road Canton, Cardiff CF5 4HJ / GB | [1993/35] | Representative(s) | Blatchford, William Michael, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/35] | Blatchford, William Michael, et al Withers & Rogers 4 Dyer's Buildings Holborn London EC1N 2JT / GB | Application number, filing date | 93301408.6 | 25.02.1993 | [1993/35] | Priority number, date | GB19920004218 | 27.02.1992 Original published format: GB 9204218 | [1993/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0558318 | Date: | 01.09.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0558318 | Date: | 08.12.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.10.1993 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/38 | [1993/47] | CPC: |
A61B18/14 (EP,US);
A61B18/1442 (EP,US);
A61B18/085 (EP,US);
A61B18/1402 (EP,US);
A61B2017/0088 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00077 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00107 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00119 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00148 (EP,US);
A61B2018/1435 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1993/35] | A61B17/39 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1993/35] | Title | German: | Bipolares RF-elektrochirurgisches Gerät | [1993/35] | English: | Apparatus for radio frequency bipolar electrosurgery | [1993/35] | French: | Dispositif de électrochirurgie bipolaire RF | [1993/35] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 08.06.1994 | Examination requested [1994/32] | 19.10.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.04.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.08.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.12.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1996/30] | 12.02.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1996/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.1996 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]USRE31723E ; | [X]US4219025 (JOHNSON DONALD M [US]); | [Y]DE3707820 (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO [JP]); | [YD]GB2214430 (GOBLE NIGEL MARK, et al); | [A]FR2647683 (KYOCERA CORP [JP], et al); | [A]CH384134 (KUHN HANS [CH]); | [A]DE75343 ; | [A]US4691703 (AUTH DAVID C [US], et al) |