EP0562824 - Thermal recording material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.04.1998 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.06.1998 [1998/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD. 210 Nakanuma Minami-Ashigara-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1993/39] | For all designated states FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD. 210 Nakanuma Minami Ashigara-shi Kanagawa / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kawakami, Hiroshi, c/o Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd. 200, Onakazato Fujinomiya-shi, Shizuoka / JP | 02 /
Nozaki, Chiyoshi, c/o Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd. 200, Onakazato Fujinomiya-shi, Shizuoka / JP | 03 /
Iwakura, Ken, c/o Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd. 200, Onakazato Fujinomiya-shi, Shizuoka / JP | [1993/39] | Representative(s) | Bubb, Antony John Allen, et al Wilson Gunn Chancery House, Chancery Lane London WC2A 1QU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/16] | Bubb, Antony John Allen, et al GEE & CO. Chancery House Chancery Lane London WC2A 1QU / GB | ||
Former [1993/39] | Moore, Anthony John, et al Gee & Co. Chancery House Chancery Lane London WC2A 1QU / GB | Application number, filing date | 93302204.8 | 23.03.1993 | [1993/39] | Priority number, date | JP19920066212 | 24.03.1992 Original published format: JP 6621292 | [1993/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0562824 | Date: | 29.09.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0562824 | Date: | 27.07.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0562824 | Date: | 11.06.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.06.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B41M5/30 | [1993/39] | CPC: |
B41M5/3333 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB [1993/39] | Title | German: | Wärmeempfindliches Aufzeichnungsmaterial | [1993/39] | English: | Thermal recording material | [1993/39] | French: | Matériau d'enregistrement thermosensible | [1993/39] | Examination procedure | 04.10.1994 | Examination requested [1994/48] | 16.11.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.03.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.05.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.09.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.11.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 29.11.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.03.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]JPS60184879 ; | [A]JPS59135188 ; | [A]JPS6251480 ; | [A]EP0232907 (KANZAKI PAPER MFG CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-8 * claim - *; | [A]DE4032493 (RICOH CO.,LTD) [A] 1-8 * claim - *; | [A]DE2655184 (CELLOPHANE SA) [A] 1-8 * page 7; claim - * | [AD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860205), vol. 10, no. 29, Database accession no. (M - 451)<2086> , & JP60184879 A 00000000 (MITSUBISHI SEISHI K.K.) [AD] 1-8 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19841204), vol. 8, no. 263, Database accession no. (M - 342)<1700> , & JP59135188 A 00000000 (ASAHI KASEI KOGYO K.K.) [A] 1-8 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870805), vol. 11, no. 238, Database accession no. (M - 613)<2685> , & JP62051480 A 00000000 (RICOH CO. LTD.) [A] 1-8 * abstract * |