EP0573277 - Apertured abrasive absorbent composite nonwoven web [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.02.1997 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.02.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.04.1997 [1997/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KIMBERLY-CLARK LIMITED Larkfield Maidstone Kent, ME20 7PS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/49] | For all designated states KIMBERLY-CLARK LIMITED Larkfield Maidstone Kent, ME20 7PS / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Currie, Kenneth J.G. 7 Ffordd Y Glyn Holywell, Clwyd / GB | 02 /
Mogel, Philip J. Isfryn, Penny-Cefn Road Caerswys, Clwyd / GB | [1993/49] | Representative(s) | Allen, Oliver John Richard Lloyd Wise, Tregear & Co., Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street London WC1A 1LW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/49] | Allen, Oliver John Richard Lloyd Wise, Tregear & Co. Norman House 105-109 Strand London, WC2R 0AE / GB | Application number, filing date | 93304274.9 | 02.06.1993 | [1993/49] | Priority number, date | GB19920011672 | 02.06.1992 Original published format: GB 9211672 | [1993/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0573277 | Date: | 08.12.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0573277 | Date: | 10.04.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.09.1993 | Classification | IPC: | D04H13/00, D04H1/56, A47L13/17, B32B5/26 | [1993/49] | CPC: |
A47L13/17 (EP,US);
D04H1/76 (KR);
B32B27/12 (US);
B32B27/285 (US);
B32B27/304 (US);
B32B27/306 (US);
B32B27/32 (US);
B32B27/34 (US);
B32B27/36 (US);
B32B3/266 (US);
B32B38/04 (US);
B32B5/022 (US);
B32B5/26 (EP,US);
D04H1/4291 (KR);
D04H1/4334 (KR);
D04H1/435 (KR);
D04H1/559 (EP,US);
D04H1/56 (EP,US);
D04H1/724 (EP,US);
D04H13/00 (EP,US);
D04H3/14 (EP,US);
D04H3/16 (EP,US);
B32B2262/0238 (US);
B32B2262/0253 (US);
B32B2262/0261 (US);
B32B2262/0276 (US);
B32B2307/718 (US);
B32B2309/02 (US);
B32B2323/04 (US);
B32B2323/10 (US);
B32B2327/06 (US);
B32B2367/00 (US);
B32B2379/08 (US);
B32B2432/00 (US);
B32B2535/00 (US);
B32B2555/00 (US);
Y10S428/903 (EP,US);
Y10T156/1056 (EP,US);
Y10T156/1062 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1993/49] | Title | German: | Schleifender, absorbierender Verbundvliesstoff mit Öffnungen | [1993/49] | English: | Apertured abrasive absorbent composite nonwoven web | [1993/49] | French: | Bande composite non-tissé trouée, abrasive et absorbant | [1993/49] | Examination procedure | 19.05.1994 | Examination requested [1994/29] | 27.02.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.05.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.07.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.10.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.01.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 08.01.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.01.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2017485 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG); | [A]US4355066 (NEWMAN NICHOLAS S); | [AD]US4659609 (LAMERS GREGORY C [US], et al); | [A]WO9004060 (KIMBERLY CLARK CO [US]); | [AP]US5213588 (WONG ARTHUR [US], et al) | by applicant | US3692618 | US3978185 | US4659609 |