EP0573286 - Limit stop for disc drives [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.01.2000 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SEAGATE TECHNOLOGY INTERNATIONAL P.O. Box 309 Georgetown Grand Cayman Island / KY | [N/P] |
Former [1993/49] | For all designated states SEAGATE TECHNOLOGY INTERNATIONAL c/o Maples & Calder P.O. Box 309 Georgetown Grand Cayman Island / KY | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hudson, Andrew J. 148 Peach Terrace Santa Cruz, California 95060 / US | 02 /
Jue, Clifford T. 111 Ponderosa Court Santa Cruz, California 95060 / US | [1993/49] | Representative(s) | Kenyon, Sarah Elizabeth, et al Miller Sturt Kenyon 9 John Street London WC1N 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/41] | Kenyon, Sarah Elizabeth, et al Orchard Kenyon & Co. Staple Inn Buildings North High Holborn London WC1V 7PZ / GB | ||
Former [1994/11] | Sturt, Clifford Mark, et al J. MILLER & CO. 34 Bedford Row Holborn London WC1R 4JH / GB | ||
Former [1993/49] | Sturt, Clifford Mark J. Miller & Co. 34 Bedford Row Holborn London WC1R 4JH / GB | Application number, filing date | 93304286.3 | 02.06.1993 | [1993/49] | Priority number, date | US19920894417 | 05.06.1992 Original published format: US 894417 | [1993/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0573286 | Date: | 08.12.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0573286 | Date: | 15.06.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0573286 | Date: | 24.03.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.04.1994 | Classification | IPC: | G11B5/54, G11B21/02, G11B21/22 | [1994/22] | CPC: |
G11B21/02 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1993/49] | G11B5/54, G11B21/02 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1993/49] | Title | German: | Anschlag für Plattenlaufwerke | [1993/49] | English: | Limit stop for disc drives | [1993/49] | French: | Butée pour lecteurs de disque | [1993/49] | Examination procedure | 21.11.1994 | Examination requested [1995/03] | 30.09.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.11.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.10.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.12.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.03.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 23.03.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.12.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 24.03.1999 | IT | 24.03.1999 | [2008/05] |
Former [2006/14] | FR | 24.03.1999 | |
Former [2000/24] | FR | 20.08.1999 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US4890176 (CASEY SHAWN E [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * figures 1,6; claim 1 * [Y] 4; | [YA]US5034837 (SCHMITZ BRIAN [US]) [Y] 4 * figures 1,20,21; claim 1 * [A] 8; | [A]EP0463336 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [A] 1-3 * figures 3,8,9; claim 1 * |