EP0586234 - Skin cleansing composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.10.1996 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.10.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.12.1996 [1996/49] | Applicant(s) | For:GB
IE
Unilever PLC Unilever House Blackfriars London Greater London EC4P 4BQ / GB | For:AT
BE
CH
DE
DK
ES
FR
GR
IT
LI
NL
PT
SE
Unilever N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1995/32] | For:GB
IE
UNILEVER PLC Unilever House Blackfriars London EC4P 4BQ / GB | ||
For:AT
BE
CH
DE
DK
ES
FR
GR
IT
LI
NL
PT
SE
UNILEVER N.V. Weena 455 NL-3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | |||
Former [1994/10] | For:GB
IE
UNILEVER PLC Unilever House Blackfriars London EC4P 4BQ / GB | ||
For:AT
BE
CH
DE
DK
ES
FR
GR
IT
LI
NL
PT
SE
UNILEVER N.V. Weena 455 NL-3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hagan, Desmond Bernard 35 Hookstone Drive, Little Sutton South Wirral, Cheshire L66 4TE / GB | 02 /
Lyle, Ian Gardner 60 Highland Avenue, Aston Park Deeside, Clwyd CH5 1XQ, Wales / GB | [1994/10] | Representative(s) | Mulder, Cornelis Willem Reinier, et al Unilever Patent Group Colworth House Sharnbrook Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/23] | Mulder, Cornelis Willem Reinier, Dr., et al Unilever PLC, Patent Division, Colworth House Sharnbrook, Bedford MK44 1LQ / NL | ||
Former [1994/10] | Ford, Michael Frederick MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 93306889.2 | 01.09.1993 | [1994/10] | Priority number, date | GB19920018792 | 04.09.1992 Original published format: GB 9218792 | [1994/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0586234 | Date: | 09.03.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0586234 | Date: | 08.06.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.04.1994 | Classification | IPC: | A61K7/48, A61K7/08, A61K7/50, C11D1/83, A61K7/02 | [1994/23] | CPC: |
A61Q1/14 (EP,KR);
A61K8/39 (EP,KR);
A61K8/4973 (KR);
A61K8/90 (EP,KR);
A61Q19/10 (EP,KR);
A61K2800/596 (EP,KR)
|
Former IPC [1994/10] | A61K7/48, A61K7/08, A61K7/50, C11D1/83 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1994/10] | Title | German: | Hautreinigungsmittel | [1994/10] | English: | Skin cleansing composition | [1994/10] | French: | Composition pour le nettoyage de la peau | [1994/10] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 25.11.1994 | Examination requested [1995/04] | 02.02.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.06.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1996/49] | 10.07.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1996/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]EP0541347 (UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al) [XP] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [X]FR2370090 (UNILEVER NV [NL]) [X] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [X]US3869412 (WAAG AKE) [X] 1-14 * column W *; | [A]EP0145865 (KAO CORP [JP]) [A] 1-14 * page 6, line 1 - line 4; claims 1-3; tables 2-3 *; | [A]EP0371801 (UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2324288 (KAO CORP [JP]) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [A]GB2242686 (KAO CORP [JP]) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [PX]US5208074 (KOSAL JEFFREY A [US]) [PX] 1,3-9,11-14 * column W * |