EP0600660 - Information processing system which can check secondary storage medium having prescribed relation therewith and secondary storage device therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1994/23] | Information processing system which can check secondary storage medium having prescribed relation therewith and secondary storage device therefore | ||
[2005/23] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.02.2006 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NINTENDO CO., LTD. 11-1, Hokotate-cho Kamitoba Minami-ku Kyoto 601 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/34] | For all designated states Nintendo Co., Limited 11-1, Hokotate-cho, Kamitoba Minami-ku, Kyoto 601 / JP | ||
Former [1994/23] | For all designated states NINTENDO CO., LTD. 60, Fukuine Kamitakamatsu-cho, Higashiyama-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 605 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nagano, Masakazu, c/o NINTENDO CO LTD. 60 Kamitakamatsu-cho, Fukuine, Higashiyama-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 605 / JP | 02 /
Tanaka, Kunihiro, c/o NINTENDO CO LTD. 60 Kamitakamatsu-cho, Fukuine, Higashiyama-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 605 / JP | 03 /
Hibino, Toshiro, c/o NINTENDO CO LTD. 60 Kamitakamatsu-cho, Fukuine, Higashiyama-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 605 / JP | 04 /
Sato, Hiroshi, c/o NINTENDO CO LTD. 60 Kamitakamatsu-cho, Fukuine, Higashiyama-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 605 / JP | [1994/23] | Representative(s) | Perkins, Sarah, et al Stevens Hewlett & Perkins 1 St Augustine's Place Bristol BS1 4UD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/14] | Perkins, Sarah, et al Stevens, Hewlett & Perkins Halton House 20/23 Holborn London EC1N 2JD / GB | ||
Former [1994/23] | Wilkinson, Stephen John Stevens, Hewlett & Perkins 1 St. Augustine's Place Bristol BS1 4UD / GB | Application number, filing date | 93309380.9 | 24.11.1993 | [1994/23] | Priority number, date | JP19920341164 | 26.11.1992 Original published format: JP 34116492 | [1994/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0600660 | Date: | 08.06.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/23] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0600660 | Date: | 26.10.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.09.1994 | Classification | IPC: | G06F1/00 | [1994/23] | CPC: |
G06F21/80 (EP,US);
G11B7/00 (KR);
G06F21/10 (EP,US);
G06F2211/007 (EP,US);
G06F2221/2109 (EP,US);
G06F2221/2121 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1994/23] | Title | German: | Informationsverarbeitungssystem, das einen sekundären, in Zusammenhang mit dem System stehenden Speicherungsträger kontrollieren kann und ein solches sekundäres Speicherungsgerät | [1994/23] | English: | Information processing system which can check secondary storage medium having prescribed relation therewith and secondary storage device therefor | [2005/23] | French: | Système de traitement de données qui contrôle un dispositif de stockage secondaire avec lequel il est en rapport, et un tel dispositif de stockage secondaire | [2005/21] |
Former [1994/23] | Information processing system which can check secondary storage medium having prescribed relation therewith and secondary storage device therefore | ||
Former [1994/23] | Système de traitement de données qui contrôle un rapport de stockage secondaire auquel il a un support ordonné, et un tel dispositif de stockage secondaire | Examination procedure | 30.03.1995 | Examination requested [1995/21] | 23.02.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.07.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.10.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.03.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.08.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.03.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.04.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.09.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/14] | 02.11.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2006/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 17.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 08.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 09.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 10.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 03.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2005 | 13   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DX]EP0206704 (NINTENDO CO LTD [JP]) [DX] 1-3,5-7,9-14,16 * abstract * * page 1, line 1 - page 9, line 14 * * page 23, line 7 - page 24, line 20 * * claims 1-7 *; | [A]US4891504 (GUPTA OM P [US]) [A] 1,9 * column A; figures 1,2 ** column 1, line 60 - column 3, line 12 *; | [A]EP0449530 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1,5,7 * abstract * * column 4, line 42 - column 6, line 14 * |