|
01.02.2002 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.02.2002 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.12.2001 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.12.2001 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.12.2001 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.12.2001 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
22 |
|
04.12.2001 |
F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.11.2001 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.11.2001 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.11.2001 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
31.10.2001 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.10.2001 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.07.2001 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.07.2001 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.06.2001 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.05.2001 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.05.2001 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.05.2001 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.05.2001 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.05.2001 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.05.2001 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.05.2001 |
Oral proceedings: Annex to summons |
Appeal |
3 |
|
14.05.2001 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.03.2001 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.03.2001 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.02.2001 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.02.2001 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.02.2001 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.02.2001 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
10 |
|
22.12.2000 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.12.2000 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.12.2000 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.12.2000 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.12.2000 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.10.2000 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.10.2000 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.10.2000 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.10.2000 |
Decision rejecting the opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
12.10.2000 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
6 |
|
12.10.2000 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.07.2000 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.07.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.07.2000 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.05.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.05.2000 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.05.2000 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.05.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.05.2000 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.04.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.04.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.04.2000 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.04.2000 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.04.2000 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.04.2000 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.04.2000 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.04.2000 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
3 |
|
05.04.2000 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
05.04.2000 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.04.2000 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.03.2000 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.03.2000 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.03.2000 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.03.2000 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.03.2000 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.03.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.02.2000 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
4 |
|
23.09.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.09.1999 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
4 |
|
05.05.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.04.1999 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
3 |
|
12.04.1999 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
6 |
|
20.11.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.11.1998 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
30.10.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.10.1998 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.08.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.07.1998 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
7 |
|
04.07.1998 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.05.1998 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
5 |
|
27.05.1998 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
12.05.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.04.1998 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.04.1998 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
5 |
|
13.06.1997 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.05.1997 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.05.1997 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
26.05.1997 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
27.01.1997 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.01.1997 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.01.1997 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.12.1996 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.12.1996 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
19.12.1996 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
19.12.1996 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
19.12.1996 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
19.12.1996 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
26.10.1996 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.02.1996 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.11.1995 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.11.1995 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.11.1995 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.09.1995 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
25.08.1995 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.08.1995 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.08.1995 |
Disapproval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.07.1995 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.07.1995 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
26.05.1995 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.05.1995 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.05.1995 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.04.1995 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
26.07.1994 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.12.1993 |
Refund order search fee |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.11.1993 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.11.1993 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.07.1993 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.07.1993 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.07.1993 |
Description |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
23.07.1993 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.07.1993 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.07.1993 |
Letter concerning search matters |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.07.1993 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
23.07.1993 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
6 |