|
11.11.2008 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.10.2008 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.10.2008 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.06.2007 |
Notice on debiting of fees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.05.2007 |
Filing of the translation of the amended claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.05.2007 |
French translation of claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
31.05.2007 |
German translation of the claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.05.2007 |
Filing of the translation of the amended claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
30.05.2007 |
Filing of the translation of the amended claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.05.2007 |
French translation of claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.05.2007 |
German translation of the claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.05.2007 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.02.2007 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.02.2007 |
Communication to opponent concerning maintenance |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.02.2007 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.02.2007 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.01.2007 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.09.2005 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.09.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.09.2005 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.09.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.09.2005 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.09.2005 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.09.2005 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.09.2005 |
Text intended for grant |
Opposition |
15 |
|
01.09.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.09.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.09.2005 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.08.2005 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.08.2005 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.09.2004 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.09.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.09.2004 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.09.2004 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.08.2004 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.08.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.08.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.08.2004 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.08.2004 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.07.2004 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
5 |
|
14.07.2004 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
14.07.2004 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.07.2004 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.06.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.05.2004 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.05.2004 |
Description |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.05.2004 |
Description |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.05.2004 |
Description |
Opposition |
4 |
|
27.05.2004 |
Description |
Opposition |
4 |
|
27.05.2004 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.05.2004 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.05.2004 |
Description |
Opposition |
10 |
|
24.05.2004 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.02.2004 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.02.2004 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
13.02.2004 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.02.2004 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
21 |
|
14.11.2003 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
6 |
|
10.10.2003 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.10.2003 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.10.2003 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
07.10.2003 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
07.10.2003 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.10.2003 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.10.2003 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.10.2003 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
18 |
|
07.10.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.10.2003 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
32 |
|
29.07.2003 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.07.2003 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.07.2003 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.07.2003 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.07.2003 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.07.2003 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.07.2003 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.07.2003 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.07.2003 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.01.2003 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.09.2002 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.08.2002 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.08.2002 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.02.2002 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.02.2002 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.02.2002 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
12 |
|
11.02.2002 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
18 |
|
04.02.2002 |
Refund of fees |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.12.2001 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.12.2001 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.11.2001 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.11.2001 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.09.2001 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.08.2001 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.07.2001 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.07.2001 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.07.2001 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
25.07.2001 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
11 |
|
25.07.2001 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
25.07.2001 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
25.07.2001 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
19.07.2001 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.07.2001 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.07.2001 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
19.07.2001 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
19.07.2001 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
19.07.2001 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.07.2001 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
13 |
|
28.05.2001 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.05.2001 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.05.2001 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.05.2001 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.05.2001 |
Authorisation |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.05.2001 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.05.2001 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.03.2001 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.03.2001 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.03.2001 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.03.2001 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.03.2001 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
9 |
|
16.03.2001 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
3 |
|
16.03.2001 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.03.2001 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
7 |
|
16.03.2001 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
16.03.2001 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.03.2001 |
Text intended for grant |
Opposition |
12 |
|
22.01.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.01.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.01.2001 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.01.2001 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
15.01.2001 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
9 |
|
12.01.2001 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
14 |
|
04.01.2001 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.01.2001 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.05.2000 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.05.2000 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.04.2000 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.04.2000 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.04.2000 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.04.2000 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.04.2000 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.04.2000 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.04.2000 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.04.2000 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.04.2000 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.04.2000 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.04.2000 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.04.2000 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.03.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.03.2000 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.03.2000 |
N/A |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.02.2000 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.02.2000 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.02.2000 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
7 |
|
25.02.2000 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
11 |
|
17.01.2000 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.01.2000 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.01.2000 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.01.2000 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.10.1999 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.10.1999 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.06.1999 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.06.1999 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.06.1999 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.05.1999 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
28.05.1999 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
28.05.1999 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
22.05.1999 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.05.1999 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
3 |
|
20.05.1999 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.05.1999 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
19.05.1999 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
09.07.1998 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.06.1998 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the applicant/patent proprietor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.06.1998 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.06.1998 |
Request for change of address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.06.1998 |
Request for change of address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.06.1998 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.06.1998 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.06.1998 |
Disapproval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.06.1998 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.06.1998 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.02.1998 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.02.1998 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
28.10.1997 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.10.1997 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.10.1997 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.10.1997 |
Description |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
13.10.1997 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.06.1997 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.06.1997 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.03.1997 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.03.1997 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.03.1997 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.01.1997 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.01.1997 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.01.1997 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.09.1996 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.02.1995 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.06.1994 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.06.1994 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
30 |
|
06.06.1994 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
06.06.1994 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
06.05.1994 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.05.1994 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.01.1994 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.01.1994 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
18.01.1994 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
18.01.1994 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
23 |
|
19.11.1993 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.11.1993 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.11.1993 |
Description |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
19.11.1993 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.11.1993 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
19.11.1993 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
6 |